US HB2546 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 18 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-05-19 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Communications and Technology.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Communications and Technology Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 18 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-05-19 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Communications and Technology.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Communications and Technology Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
FCC CIO Parity Act This bill requires the Federal Communications Commission (FCC) to ensure that its Chief Information Officer has a significant role in: (1) the decision-making process for annual and multi-year planning, programming, budgeting, execution decisions, and reports related to information technology; (2) the management, governance, and oversight processes related to information technology; and (3) the hiring of personnel with information technology responsibilities. The Chief Information Officer must consult with the FCC Chief Financial Officer and budget officials to specify and approve the allocation of amounts appropriated to the FCC for information technology.
Title
FCC CIO Parity Act
Sponsors
Rep. Mimi Walters [R-CA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-19 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Communications and Technology. |
2017-05-18 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce. |
2017-05-18 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB2210 (Related) 2017-12-07 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
HB4986 (Related) 2018-03-07 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
HB4986 (Related) 2018-03-07 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
Subjects
Computers and information technology
Executive agency funding and structure
Federal Communications Commission (FCC)
Federal officials
Government employee pay, benefits, personnel management
Science, technology, communications
Executive agency funding and structure
Federal Communications Commission (FCC)
Federal officials
Government employee pay, benefits, personnel management
Science, technology, communications
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/115th-congress/house-bill/2546/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/115/bills/hr2546/BILLS-115hr2546ih.pdf |