US HB2529 | 2011-2012 | 112th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 54-5)
Status: Introduced on July 14 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-07-20 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on July 14 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-07-20 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Restoring Access to Medication Act - Repeals provisions of the Patient Protection and Affordable Care Act that limited payments for medications from health savings accounts, medical savings accounts, and health flexible spending arrangements to only prescription drugs or insulin. Rescinds appropriated but unobligated discretionary funds determined by the Director of the Office of Management and Budget (OMB) to be equal to the reduction in tax revenues resulting from the repeal in this Act. Requires the Director to report to the Secretary of the Treasury and Congress the accounts and amounts identified for rescission. Exempts unobligated funds of the Department of Veterans Affairs (VA) or the Social Security Administration (SSA).
Title
Restoring Access to Medication Act
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-07-20 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2011-07-14 | House | Referred to House Appropriations |
2011-07-14 | House | Referred to House Ways and Means |
2011-07-14 | House | Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means, and in addition to the Committee on Appropriations, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1368 (Same As) 2011-07-14 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
HB524 (Related) 2011-02-14 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
HB5842 (Related) 2012-06-05 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 364.
HB524 (Related) 2011-02-14 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
HB5842 (Related) 2012-06-05 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 364.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/112th-congress/house-bill/2529/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/112/bills/hr2529/BILLS-112hr2529ih.pdf |