US HB2522 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 3 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-05-31 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Immigration and Citizenship.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Immigration and Citizenship Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

HUMANE Act of 2019 Humanitarian Upgrades to Manage and Assist our Nation's Enforcement Act of 2019

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

HUMANE Act of 2019 Humanitarian Upgrades to Manage and Assist our Nation's Enforcement Act of 2019

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-31HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Immigration and Citizenship.
2019-05-13HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Border Security, Facilitation, and Operations.
2019-05-06HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings, and Emergency Management.
2019-05-03HouseReferred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committees on Foreign Affairs, Homeland Security, Ways and Means, Agriculture, and Transportation and Infrastructure, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2019-05-03HouseReferred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committees on Foreign Affairs, Homeland Security, Ways and Means, Agriculture, and Transportation and Infrastructure, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2019-05-03HouseReferred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committees on Foreign Affairs, Homeland Security, Ways and Means, Agriculture, and Transportation and Infrastructure, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2019-05-03HouseReferred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committees on Foreign Affairs, Homeland Security, Ways and Means, Agriculture, and Transportation and Infrastructure, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2019-05-03HouseReferred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committees on Foreign Affairs, Homeland Security, Ways and Means, Agriculture, and Transportation and Infrastructure, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2019-05-03HouseReferred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committees on Foreign Affairs, Homeland Security, Ways and Means, Agriculture, and Transportation and Infrastructure, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2019-05-03HouseIntroduced in House

Same As/Similar To

SB1303 (Same As) 2019-05-02 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. (Sponsor introductory remarks on measure: CR S2616-2617)

Subjects

Administrative remedies
Advanced technology and technological innovations
Assault and harassment offenses
Border security and unlawful immigration
Building construction
Child health
Child safety and welfare
Civil actions and liability
Congressional oversight
Crime victims
Crimes against children
Crimes against women
Criminal investigation, prosecution, interrogation
Criminal justice information and records
Customs enforcement
Department of Homeland Security
Detention of persons
Disability and paralysis
Domestic violence and child abuse
Employee hiring
Executive agency funding and structure
Family relationships
Fraud offenses and financial crimes
Genetics
Government buildings, facilities, and property
Government employee pay, benefits, personnel management
Government ethics and transparency, public corruption
Government information and archives
Government studies and investigations
Guatemala
Health personnel
Human trafficking
Immigrant health and welfare
Immigration
Immigration status and procedures
Intergovernmental relations
Judges
Judicial procedure and administration
Judicial review and appeals
Juvenile crime and gang violence
Latin America
Law enforcement officers
Lawyers and legal services
Mental health
Mexico
Photography and imaging
Public contracts and procurement
Refugees, asylum, displaced persons
Separation, divorce, custody, support
Sex offenses
State and local government operations
Violent crime
Visas and passports

US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback