US HB252 | 2013-2014 | 113th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 15 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-02-25 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Middle East and North Africa.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Middle East and North Africa Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 15 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-02-25 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Middle East and North Africa.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Middle East and North Africa Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Jerusalem Embassy and Recognition Act of 2013 - States that it is U.S. policy: (1) to recognize Jerusalem as the undivided capital of Israel, and (2) that the U.S. Embassy in Israel should be established in Jerusalem not later than January 1, 2015. Amends the Jerusalem Embassy Act of 1995 to eliminate the President's authority to waive certain funding limitations for Department of State acquisition and maintenance of buildings abroad until the U.S. Embassy in Jerusalem has officially opened. Requires any official U.S. document which lists countries and their capital cities to identify Jerusalem as Israel's capital. Limits appropriations that may be obligated in FY2015 for Department acquisition and maintenance of buildings abroad until the U.S. Embassy in Jerusalem has officially opened. States that for each of FY2013-FY2014, of funds authorized to be appropriated for Department acquisition and maintenance of buildings abroad, necessary sums should be made available until expended only for construction and other costs associated with the establishment in Jerusalem of the U.S. Embassy in Israel.
Title
Jerusalem Embassy and Recognition Act of 2013
Sponsors
Rep. Jason Chaffetz [R-UT] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-02-25 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Middle East and North Africa. |
2013-01-15 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Foreign Affairs. |
Same As/Similar To
HB104 (Related) 2013-02-25 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Middle East and North Africa.
SB604 (Related) 2013-03-19 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.
SB604 (Related) 2013-03-19 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.
Subjects
Appropriations
Congressional oversight
Department of State
Diplomacy, foreign officials, Americans abroad
Government buildings, facilities, and property
Government information and archives
International affairs
Israel
Middle East
Presidents and presidential powers
Sovereignty, recognition, national governance and status
Congressional oversight
Department of State
Diplomacy, foreign officials, Americans abroad
Government buildings, facilities, and property
Government information and archives
International affairs
Israel
Middle East
Presidents and presidential powers
Sovereignty, recognition, national governance and status
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/113th-congress/house-bill/252/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/113/bills/hr252/BILLS-113hr252ih.pdf |