US HB2518 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on May 18 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-06-26 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 133.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Coast Guard Authorization Act of 2017 This bill authorizes: (1) appropriations for the Coast Guard for FY2018-FY2019, and (2) a specified level of end-of-year strength for active duty personnel and military training student loads for such fiscal years. The bill addresses: (1) training for public safety personnel, (2) service member benefits for Coast Guard personnel, (3) unmanned aircraft systems, and (4) ports and waterways safety. The bill revises or sets forth policies relating to the Coast Guard, including Coast Guard health care professionals; incentive contracts for Coast Guard Yard or Coast Guard industrial establishments; contracting for major acquisition programs; National Security Cutters; Fast Response Cutters; ice trials of icebreaker vessels; vessel operations; numbering for undocumented barges; drawbridges; the alternate safety compliance program; visual distress signals; vessel certification; the land-based enhanced LORAN, positioning, navigation, and timing system; the installation and use of engine cut-off switches on recreational vessels; commercial fishing vessel classification requirements; aids to navigation; maritime domain awareness technologies; towing vessel inspections; and vessel response plans in the Arctic.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Coast Guard Authorization Act of 2017

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-26HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 133.
2017-06-26HouseReported (Amended) by the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure. H. Rept. 115-194.
2017-05-24HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
2017-05-24HouseOrdered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote.
2017-05-24HouseSubcommittee on Coast Guard and Maritime Transportation Discharged.
2017-05-19HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Coast Guard and Maritime Transportation.
2017-05-18HouseReferred to the House Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure.
2017-05-18HouseIntroduced in House

Same As/Similar To

SB1129 (Related) 2017-06-05 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 112.
HB5515 (Related) 2018-07-11 - Message on Senate action sent to the House.

Subjects

Accounting and auditing
Administrative law and regulatory procedures
Advisory bodies
Alaska
Arctic and polar regions
Civil actions and liability
Coast guard
Congressional oversight
Dams and canals
Department of Homeland Security
Emergency communications systems
First responders and emergency personnel
Government trust funds
Great Lakes
Health personnel
Illinois
Lakes and rivers
Land transfers
Licensing and registrations
Marine and coastal resources, fisheries
Marine and inland water transportation
Marine pollution
Military personnel and dependents
Military procurement, research, weapons development
Minnesota
Navigation, waterways, harbors
New York State
Oil and gas
Pollution liability
Public contracts and procurement
Solid waste and recycling
Transportation and public works
Transportation employees
Transportation programs funding
Transportation safety and security
User charges and fees
Water quality
Worker safety and health

US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback