US HB2513 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Introduced on May 18 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-06-23 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, and Investigations.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, And Investigations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 18 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-06-23 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, and Investigations.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, And Investigations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Police Officers Protecting Children Act This bill amends the federal criminal code to specify that certain retired and off-duty law enforcement officers who are authorized to carry concealed firearms are not subject to the federal prohibitions on possessing or discharging a firearm in a school zone.
Title
Police Officers Protecting Children Act
Sponsors
Rep. Vicky Hartzler [R-MO] | Rep. Joe Wilson [R-SC] | Rep. Glenn Grothman [R-WI] | Rep. Bill Flores [R-TX] |
Rep. Todd Rokita [R-IN] | Rep. Robert Pittenger [R-NC] | Rep. Ralph Norman [R-SC] | Rep. Francis Rooney [R-FL] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-23 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, and Investigations. |
2017-05-18 | House | Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary. |
2017-05-18 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB38 (Related) 2017-12-07 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
HR645 (Similar To) 2017-12-06 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
HR645 (Similar To) 2017-12-06 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Subjects
Child safety and welfare
Crime and law enforcement
Elementary and secondary education
Firearms and explosives
Law enforcement officers
School administration
Crime and law enforcement
Elementary and secondary education
Firearms and explosives
Law enforcement officers
School administration
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/115th-congress/house-bill/2513/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/115/bills/hr2513/BILLS-115hr2513ih.pdf |