US HB2513 | 2015-2016 | 114th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 36-4)
Status: Introduced on May 21 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-06-03 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 21 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-06-03 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
PACE Act of 2015 Promoting Access, Competition, and Equity Act of 2015 This bill amends title XVIII (Medicare) of the Social Security Act to ease application criteria and procedures for physician-owned hospitals to expand their facilities. Under current law, expansion of physician-owned hospitals is subject to certain limitations, such as those regarding the extent and frequency of expansion and requiring community output. The bill suspends these limitations with respect to applications for expansion filed before October 1, 2019. Following the end of this suspension period, hospitals with consistently high quality ratings are included among those hospitals that may apply to expand their facilities. The Centers for Medicare & Medicaid Services may not alter the methodology for computing a hospital's quality rating before October 1, 2019. With respect to hospitals under development as of March 23, 2010, the bill extends to May 1, 2015, the date by which a hospital may qualify for an exception to the ownership or investment prohibition on physician self-referrals. The bill also: (1) exempts physician-owned hospitals from specified documentation and coding adjustments, and (2) extends reductions in certain inflationary increases associated with Medicare payments for inpatient hospital services.
Title
PACE Act of 2015 Promoting Access, Competition, and Equity Act of 2015
Sponsors
Rep. Sam Johnson [R-TX] | Rep. Ruben Hinojosa [D-TX] | Rep. Roger Williams [R-TX] | Rep. Kenny Marchant [R-TX] |
Rep. Pete Sessions [R-TX] | Rep. Larry Bucshon [R-IN] | Rep. Sheila Jackson-Lee [D-TX] | Rep. David Schweikert [R-AZ] |
Rep. Michael Burgess [R-TX] | Rep. John Carter [R-TX] | Rep. Kevin Brady [R-TX] | Rep. Todd Rokita [R-IN] |
Rep. Susan Brooks [R-IN] | Rep. Paul Gosar [R-AZ] | Sen. Todd Young [R-IN] | Rep. Jeb Hensarling [R-TX] |
Rep. Pete Olson [R-TX] | Rep. Bill Johnson [R-OH] | Rep. Steve Womack [R-AR] | Rep. Bruce Westerman [R-AR] |
Rep. Renee Ellmers [R-NC] | Rep. French Hill [R-AR] | Rep. Joe Barton [R-TX] | Sen. Markwayne Mullin [R-OK] |
Rep. Tom Price [R-GA] | Rep. David Valadao [R-CA] | Rep. Bill Flores [R-TX] | Rep. Reid Ribble [R-WI] |
Rep. Eric Crawford [R-AR] | Rep. Jim Bridenstine [R-OK] | Rep. Mike Pompeo [R-KS] | Rep. Ruben Gallego [D-AZ] |
Rep. John Fleming [R-LA] | Rep. Andre Carson [D-IN] | Rep. James Sensenbrenner [R-WI] | Rep. Brad Wenstrup [R-OH] |
Rep. Tom Graves [R-GA] | Rep. Ted Poe [R-TX] | Rep. Mac Thornberry [R-TX] | Rep. Brian Babin [R-TX] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-03 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2015-05-22 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2015-05-21 | House | Referred to House Energy and Commerce |
2015-05-21 | House | Referred to House Ways and Means |
2015-05-21 | House | Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means, and in addition to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2015-05-21 | House | Introduced in House |
Subjects
Health
Health care quality
Health facilities and institutions
Health personnel
Hospital care
Inflation and prices
Medicare
Health care quality
Health facilities and institutions
Health personnel
Hospital care
Inflation and prices
Medicare
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/114th-congress/house-bill/2513/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/114/bills/hr2513/BILLS-114hr2513ih.pdf |