US HB2503 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 43-7)
Status: Introduced on April 14 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-07-15 - Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee (Amended) by Voice Vote .
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 14 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-07-15 - Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee (Amended) by Voice Vote .
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To direct the Secretary of Health and Human Services to establish an interagency council on social determinants of health, and for other purposes.
Title
Social Determinants Accelerator Act of 2021
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-07-15 | House | Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee (Amended) by Voice Vote . |
2021-07-15 | House | Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2021-04-15 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2021-04-14 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce. |
2021-04-14 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB4486 (Related) 2022-06-23 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/117th-congress/house-bill/2503/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/117/bills/hr2503/BILLS-117hr2503ih.pdf |