US HB2490 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 17 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-05-17 - Referred to the House Committee on Education and the Workforce.
Pending: House Education And The Workforce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 17 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-05-17 - Referred to the House Committee on Education and the Workforce.
Pending: House Education And The Workforce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Working Students Act This bill amends the Higher Education Act of 1965 to modify the income protection allowance levels used to calculate a student's expected family contribution and need for financial assistance. (An income protection allowance is an amount for basic living expenses that is protected from being considered income available for postsecondary educational expenses.)
Title
Working Students Act
Sponsors
Rep. Ami Bera [D-CA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-17 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Education and the Workforce. |
2017-05-17 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB2451 (Related) 2017-05-16 - Referred to the Committee on Education and the Workforce, and in addition to the Committee on the Budget, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
SB1136 (Related) 2017-05-16 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
SB1155 (Same As) 2017-05-17 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
HB4074 (Related) 2017-10-26 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Nutrition.
HB4416 (Related) 2017-11-16 - Referred to the House Committee on Education and the Workforce.
SB1136 (Related) 2017-05-16 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
SB1155 (Same As) 2017-05-17 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
HB4074 (Related) 2017-10-26 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Nutrition.
HB4416 (Related) 2017-11-16 - Referred to the House Committee on Education and the Workforce.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/115th-congress/house-bill/2490/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/115/bills/hr2490/BILLS-115hr2490ih.pdf |