US HB2472 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 83-10)
Status: Introduced on May 16 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-06-07 - Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution and Civil Justice.
Pending: House Subcommittee on the Constitution And Civil Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Disability Integration Act of 2017 This bill prohibits states or local governments that provide institutional placements for individuals with disabilities who need long-term assistance with daily living activities or health-related tasks, and prohibits insurance providers that fund such long-term services, from denying community-based services that would enable such individuals to live in the community and lead an independent life. States, local governments, or insurance providers may not discriminate against such individuals in the provision of community-based services by: (1) imposing prohibited eligibility criteria, cost caps, waiting lists, or payment structures; (2) failing to provide a specific community-based service; or (3) requiring an individual to receive a service in a congregate or disability-specific setting. Community-based services must be offered to individuals with such disabilities prior to institutionalization. Institutionalized individuals must be notified regularly of community-based alternatives. States, local governments, and public insurance providers must assess: (1) transportation barriers that prevent individuals from receiving services in integrated settings, and (2) the availability of integrated employment opportunities. The Department of Justice (DOJ) and the Department of Health and Human Services (HHS) must issue regulations requiring states, local governments, or insurance providers to offer community-based long-term services to individuals with such disabilities who would otherwise qualify for institutional placement. State and local governments, in conjunction with housing agencies, must ensure sufficient availability of affordable, accessible, and integrated housing that is not a disability-specific residential setting or a setting where services are tied to tenancy. Such regulations must also require states and local governments to begin implementing a transition plan to achieve the requirements of this bill within 12 years after its enactment. For 10 years after issuance of the regulations, HHS must determine annually whether each state is complying with the transition plan. If a state is complying, HHS must increase by five percentage points the federal medical assistance percentage for a state requesting an increase for expenditures on home and community-based services furnished under the state Medicaid plan under title XIX (Medicaid) of the Social Security Act, or a waiver of such plan, that are identified as: (1) improvements to ensure accessibility or self-directed receipt of such services, (2) funding shifts from institutional settings to integrated community-based services, or (3) environmental modifications for housing targeted toward the lowest income individuals. The bill provides for DOJ enforcement and allows civil actions by individuals subjected to, or about to be subjected to, a violation of this bill.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Disability Integration Act of 2017

Sponsors

Rep. James Sensenbrenner [R]Rep. John Conyers [D]Rep. Louise Slaughter [D]Rep. Eleanor Norton [D]
Rep. Paul Tonko [D]Rep. Lisa Rochester [D]Rep. C.A. Ruppersberger [D]Rep. Ted Lieu [D]
Rep. Steve Cohen [D]Rep. Sheila Jackson-Lee [D]Rep. Diana DeGette [D]Rep. Lacy Clay [D]
Rep. Gwen Moore [D]Rep. Peter DeFazio [D]Rep. Beto O'Rourke [D]Rep. Danny Davis [D]
Rep. Lloyd Doggett [D]Rep. Robert Brady [D]Rep. Anna Eshoo [D]Rep. Peter Visclosky [D]
Rep. Gene Green [D]Rep. Daniel Donovan [R]Rep. John Lewis [D]Rep. Michelle Lujan Grisham [D]
Rep. Janice Schakowsky [D]Rep. Mark Pocan [D]Rep. Ed Perlmutter [D]Rep. Sean Maloney [D]
Rep. Amata Radewagen [D]Rep. Eddie Johnson [D]Rep. Dwight Evans [D]Rep. Timothy Walz [D]
Rep. Jamie Raskin [D]Rep. Ron Kind [D]Rep. Jared Polis [D]Rep. Peter Welch [D]
Rep. Darren Soto [D]Rep. Cathy McMorris Rodgers [R]Rep. Ro Khanna [D]Rep. Marcy Kaptur [D]
Rep. Barbara Comstock [R]Rep. Robin Kelly [D]Rep. Grace Meng [D]Rep. Eliot Engel [D]
Rep. Brendan Boyle [D]Rep. Gregg Harper [R]Rep. Raja Krishnamoorthi [D]Rep. Mike Quigley [D]
Rep. David Scott [D]Rep. Raul Grijalva [D]Rep. Jerrold Nadler [D]Rep. Collin Peterson [D]
Rep. Ruben Gallego [D]Rep. Zoe Lofgren [D]Rep. Luis Gutierrez [D]Rep. Bobby Rush [D]
Rep. Ben Lujan [D]Rep. Joseph Kennedy [D]Rep. Anthony Brown [D]Rep. John Sarbanes [D]
Rep. Brian Higgins [D]Rep. Peter Roskam [R]Rep. Nydia Velazquez [D]Rep. Bradley Schneider [D]
Rep. Hakeem Jeffries [D]Rep. Bill Foster [D]Rep. Doris Matsui [D]Rep. Gerald Connolly [D]
Rep. Scott Tipton [R]Rep. James Langevin [D]Rep. Jose Serrano [D]Rep. Tony Cardenas [D]
Rep. Mike Coffman [R]Rep. John Delaney [D]Rep. Henry Johnson [D]Rep. Eric Swalwell [D]
Rep. Alcee Hastings [D]Rep. James Himes [D]Rep. Doug Lamborn [R]Rep. Seth Moulton [D]
Rep. Pramila Jayapal [D]Rep. Yvette Clarke [D]Rep. Kathleen Rice [D]Rep. James McGovern [D]
Rep. Michael Doyle [D]Rep. Adam Smith [D]Rep. Thomas Suozzi [D]Rep. Donald Payne [D]
Rep. Frederica Wilson [D]Rep. Rodney Davis [R]Rep. Earl Blumenauer [D]Rep. Betty McCollum [D]
Rep. Conor Lamb [D]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-07HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution and Civil Justice.
2017-05-19HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Health.
2017-05-16HouseReferred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2017-05-16HouseReferred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2017-05-16HouseReferred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2017-05-16HouseIntroduced in House

Same As/Similar To

SB910 (Same As) 2017-04-07 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. (text of measure as introduced: CR S2451-2455)

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback