US HB246 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 167-8-1)
Status: Introduced on January 4 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-01-25 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 4 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-01-25 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To repeal the annual fee on health insurance providers enacted by the Patient Protection and Affordable Care Act. This bill repeals a provision of the Patient Protection and Affordable Care Act that imposes an annual fee on a health insurance provider based on its net premium income.
Title
To repeal the annual fee on health insurance providers enacted by the Patient Protection and Affordable Care Act.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-01-25 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2017-01-13 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2017-01-04 | House | Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means, and in addition to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2017-01-04 | House | Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means, and in addition to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2017-01-04 | House | Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means, and in addition to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2017-01-04 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB6311 (Related) 2018-07-26 - Received in the Senate.
Subjects
Comprehensive health care
Health
Health care costs and insurance
Health care coverage and access
Insurance industry and regulation
User charges and fees
Health
Health care costs and insurance
Health care coverage and access
Insurance industry and regulation
User charges and fees
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/115th-congress/house-bill/246/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/115/bills/hr246/BILLS-115hr246ih.pdf |