US HB2455 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Introduced on May 1 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-02 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 1 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-02 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To amend the Federal Food, Drug, and Cosmetic Act with respect to citizen petitions.
Title
Ensuring Timely Access to Generics Act of 2019
Sponsors
Rep. John Joyce [R-PA] | Rep. Anthony Brindisi [D-NY] | Rep. Ron Wright [R-TX] | Rep. Jason Crow [D-CO] |
Rep. Michael Waltz [R-FL] | Rep. Brian Fitzpatrick [R-PA] | Rep. Lloyd Smucker [R-PA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-02 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2019-05-01 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce. |
2019-05-01 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB1169 (Same As) 2019-04-11 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
SB3384 (Related) 2020-03-03 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
SB3384 (Related) 2020-03-03 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Subjects
Administrative remedies
Department of Health and Human Services
Drug safety, medical device, and laboratory regulation
Food and Drug Administration (FDA)
Government information and archives
Health
Prescription drugs
Department of Health and Human Services
Drug safety, medical device, and laboratory regulation
Food and Drug Administration (FDA)
Government information and archives
Health
Prescription drugs
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-bill/2455/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hr2455/BILLS-116hr2455ih.pdf |