US HB2449 | 2013-2014 | 113th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 26-15-1)
Status: Engrossed on September 18 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-09-18 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.
Pending: Senate Foreign Relations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on September 18 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-09-18 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.
Pending: Senate Foreign Relations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes the President to extend the term of the Agreement for Cooperation between the Government of the United States of America and the Government of the Republic of Korea Concerning Civil Uses of Nuclear Energy for a period not to exceed March 19, 2016.
Title
To authorize the President to extend the term of the Agreement for Cooperation between the Government of the United States of America and the Government of the Republic of Korea Concerning Civil Uses of Nuclear Energy for a period not to exceed March 19, 2016.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-09-17 - House - On Motion to Suspend the Rules and Pass (Y: 407 N: 0 NV: 25 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-09-18 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations. |
2013-09-17 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 407 - 0 (Roll no. 461). (text: CR H5562) |
2013-09-17 | House | Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H5573-5574) |
2013-09-17 | House | At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed. |
2013-09-17 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 2449. |
2013-09-17 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H5562-5564) |
2013-09-17 | House | Mr. Royce moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill. |
2013-09-17 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 153. |
2013-09-17 | House | Reported by the Committee on Foreign Affairs. H. Rept. 113-209. |
2013-07-24 | House | Ordered to be Reported by Unanimous Consent. |
2013-07-24 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2013-06-20 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Foreign Affairs. |
Subjects
Arms control and nonproliferation
Asia
International affairs
International law and treaties
Nuclear power
Nuclear weapons
South Korea
Asia
International affairs
International law and treaties
Nuclear power
Nuclear weapons
South Korea