US HB2442 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on April 12 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-13 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Environment and Climate Change.
Pending: House Environment and Climate Change Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 12 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-13 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Environment and Climate Change.
Pending: House Environment and Climate Change Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To require the Administrator of the Environmental Protection Agency to carry out a grant program for projects and activities to address climate justice concerns of environmental justice communities, and for other purposes.
Title
Climate Justice Grants Act
Sponsors
Rep. Nanette Barragan [D-CA] | Rep. Doris Matsui [D-CA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-13 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Environment and Climate Change. |
2021-04-12 | House | Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on Natural Resources, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2021-04-12 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB1512 (Related) 2022-06-30 - Subcommittee Hearings Held.
HB5118 (Related) 2022-08-02 - Received in the Senate.
HB5118 (Related) 2022-08-02 - Received in the Senate.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/117th-congress/house-bill/2442/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/117/bills/hr2442/BILLS-117hr2442ih.pdf |