US HB2440 | 2011-2012 | 112th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Introduced on May 25 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-07-12 - Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee (Amended) by Voice Vote .
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 25 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-07-12 - Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee (Amended) by Voice Vote .
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Market Transparency and Taxpayer Protection Act of 2011 - Directs the Director of the Federal Housing Finance Agency to require the Federal National Mortgage Association (Fannie Mae) and the Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation (Freddie Mac) (government-sponsored enterprises or GSEs) to identify to the Director all assets of value of the GSE and their functions, characteristics, and estimated value. Requires the Director then to: (1) determine which assets are critical, and which are not critical, to carrying out the GSE's mission; and (2) establish plans annually for the sale or other disposition of any non-mission critical assets.
Title
Market Transparency and Taxpayer Protection Act of 2011
Sponsors
Rep. Robert Hurt [R-VA] | Rep. Spencer Bachus [R-AL] | Rep. Francisco Canseco [R-TX] | Rep. Scott Garrett [R-NJ] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-07-12 | House | Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee (Amended) by Voice Vote . |
2011-07-12 | House | Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2011-07-11 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Capital Markets and Government Sponsored Enterprises. |
2011-07-07 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Financial Services. |
2011-05-25 | House | Hearings Held by the Subcommittee on Capital Markets and Government Sponsored Enterprises Prior to Introduction and Referral. |
Subjects
Accounting and auditing
Corporate finance and management
Government corporations and government-sponsored enterprises
Government information and archives
Housing and community development
Housing finance and home ownership
Intellectual property
Corporate finance and management
Government corporations and government-sponsored enterprises
Government information and archives
Housing and community development
Housing finance and home ownership
Intellectual property
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/112th-congress/house-bill/2440/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/112/bills/hr2440/BILLS-112hr2440ih.pdf |