US HB2437 | 2023-2024 | 118th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on March 30 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-11-15 - Ordered to be Reported in the Nature of a Substitute (Amended) by the Yeas and Nays: 19 - 15.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 30 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-11-15 - Ordered to be Reported in the Nature of a Substitute (Amended) by the Yeas and Nays: 19 - 15.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To revise the boundaries of a unit of the John H. Chafee Coastal Barrier Resources System in Topsail, North Carolina, and for other purposes.
Title
To revise the boundaries of a unit of the John H. Chafee Coastal Barrier Resources System in Topsail, North Carolina, and for other purposes.
Sponsors
Rep. Greg Murphy [R-NC] | Rep. David Rouzer [R-NC] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-11-15 | House | Ordered to be Reported in the Nature of a Substitute (Amended) by the Yeas and Nays: 19 - 15. |
2023-11-15 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held |
2023-11-15 | House | Subcommittee on Water, Wildlife, and Fisheries Discharged |
2023-09-28 | House | Subcommittee Hearings Held |
2023-05-08 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Water, Wildlife, and Fisheries. |
2023-03-30 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources. |
2023-03-30 | House | Introduced in House |
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/118th-congress/house-bill/2437/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/118/bills/hr2437/BILLS-118hr2437ih.pdf |