US HB2436 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 54-7)
Status: Introduced on May 16 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-06-08 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Biotechnology, Horticulture, and Research.
Pending: House Biotechnology, Horticulture, and Research Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 16 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-06-08 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Biotechnology, Horticulture, and Research.
Pending: House Biotechnology, Horticulture, and Research Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Organic Agriculture Research Act of 2017 This bill amends the Food, Agriculture, Conservation, and Trade Act of 1990 to increase and make permanent mandatory funding for the organic agriculture research and extension initiative and extend discretionary funding for such initiative through FY2023.
Title
Organic Agriculture Research Act of 2017
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-08 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Biotechnology, Horticulture, and Research. |
2017-05-16 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Agriculture. |
2017-05-16 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB2 (Related) 2018-12-20 - Became Public Law No: 115-334.
HR891 (Similar To) 2018-05-16 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
HB4425 (Related) 2017-11-16 - Referred to the Committee on Agriculture, and in addition to the Committees on Ways and Means, Education and the Workforce, and Foreign Affairs, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
SB3042 (Related) 2018-06-18 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 470.
HR1176 (Similar To) 2018-12-12 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
HR891 (Similar To) 2018-05-16 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
HB4425 (Related) 2017-11-16 - Referred to the Committee on Agriculture, and in addition to the Committees on Ways and Means, Education and the Workforce, and Foreign Affairs, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
SB3042 (Related) 2018-06-18 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 470.
HR1176 (Similar To) 2018-12-12 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Subjects
Agricultural conservation and pollution
Agricultural practices and innovations
Agricultural research
Agriculture and food
Food supply, safety, and labeling
Research administration and funding
Agricultural practices and innovations
Agricultural research
Agriculture and food
Food supply, safety, and labeling
Research administration and funding
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/115th-congress/house-bill/2436/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/115/bills/hr2436/BILLS-115hr2436ih.pdf |