US HB2433 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on September 13 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-09-13 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
Pending: Senate Homeland Security And Governmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on September 13 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-09-13 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
Pending: Senate Homeland Security And Governmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Homeland Security Assessment of Terrorists Use of Virtual Currencies Act (Sec. 2) This bill directs the Department of Homeland Security's Office of Intelligence and Analysis: (1) in coordination with appropriate federal partners, to develop and disseminate a threat assessment regarding the threat posed by individuals using virtual currency to carry out activities in furtherance of an act of terrorism, including the provision of material support or resources to a foreign terrorist organization; and (2) to share such assessment with state, local, and tribal law enforcement officials.
Title
Homeland Security Assessment of Terrorists Use of Virtual Currencies Act
Sponsors
Rep. Kathleen Rice [D-NY] | Rep. Derek Kilmer [D-WA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-09-13 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. |
2017-09-12 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2017-09-12 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H7242) |
2017-09-12 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 2433. |
2017-09-12 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H7242-7243) |
2017-09-12 | House | Mr. Perry moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill. |
2017-05-18 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote. |
2017-05-18 | House | Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2017-05-17 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Counterterrorism and Intelligence. |
2017-05-16 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Homeland Security. |
2017-05-16 | House | Introduced in House |
Subjects
Crime and law enforcement
Currency
Digital media
Federal-Indian relations
Fraud offenses and financial crimes
Government studies and investigations
Intelligence activities, surveillance, classified information
Internet and video services
State and local government operations
Terrorism
Currency
Digital media
Federal-Indian relations
Fraud offenses and financial crimes
Government studies and investigations
Intelligence activities, surveillance, classified information
Internet and video services
State and local government operations
Terrorism