US HB2425 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Introduced on May 16 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-12-28 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 861.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 16 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-12-28 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 861.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Public Lands Telecommunications Act This bill directs the Department of the Treasury to establish separate special accounts for the National Park Service, the U.S. Fish and Wildlife Service, the Bureau of Land Management, the Bureau of Reclamation, and the Forest Service (the federal land management agencies) for the deposit of rental fees received by such agencies for communications use authorizations on federal lands that are granted, issued, or executed by them. A "communication use authorization" is defined as a right-of-way, permit, or lease granted, issued, or executed by a federal land management agency for the primary purpose of authorizing the occupancy and use of federal lands for communications use. The rental fees received by each federal land management agency shall: be deposited in its special account, and remain available for expenditure, as provided in advance in appropriations acts, for agency activities related to communications sites (those areas of federal lands designated for telecommunications uses). The Department of the Interior and the Forest Service may enter into cooperative agreements to carry out those activities related to such sites.
Title
Public Lands Telecommunications Act
Sponsors
Rep. Jared Huffman [D-CA] | Rep. Doug LaMalfa [R-CA] | Rep. Suzan DelBene [D-WA] | Rep. Niki Tsongas [D-MA] |
Rep. Derek Kilmer [D-WA] | Rep. Anna Eshoo [D-CA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-12-28 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 861. |
2018-12-28 | House | Committee on Agriculture discharged. |
2018-12-20 | House | House Committee on Agriculture Granted an extension for further consideration ending not later than Dec. 28, 2018. |
2018-12-20 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 115-1086, Part I. |
2017-06-27 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Unanimous Consent. |
2017-06-27 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2017-06-08 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Conservation and Forestry. |
2017-05-23 | House | Subcommittee Hearings Held. |
2017-05-16 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Federal Lands. |
2017-05-16 | House | Referred to the Committee on Natural Resources, and in addition to the Committee on Agriculture, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2017-05-16 | House | Referred to the Committee on Natural Resources, and in addition to the Committee on Agriculture, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2017-05-16 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB800 (Related) 2017-02-24 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Commodity Exchanges, Energy, and Credit.
Subjects
Department of Agriculture
Department of the Interior
Forests, forestry, trees
Government trust funds
Land use and conservation
Parks, recreation areas, trails
Public lands and natural resources
Telephone and wireless communication
User charges and fees
Department of the Interior
Forests, forestry, trees
Government trust funds
Land use and conservation
Parks, recreation areas, trails
Public lands and natural resources
Telephone and wireless communication
User charges and fees