US HB2423 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 16 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-09-14 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 222.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 16 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-09-14 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 222.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Washington County, Utah, Public Lands Management Implementation Act (Sec. 1) This bill directs the Department of the Interior to grant any necessary rights-of-way for the northern transportation route in Washington County, Utah, identified pursuant to the Omnibus Public Land Management Act of 2009. Interior shall authorize the development of utilities within the Red Cliffs National Conservation Area in Utah if such development is consistent with: (1) each utility protocol referenced in the Washington County Habitat Conservation Plan (1996), and (2) any other applicable law.
Title
Washington County, Utah, Public Lands Management Implementation Act
Sponsors
Rep. Chris Stewart [R-UT] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-09-14 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 222. |
2017-09-14 | House | Reported by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 115-312. |
2017-07-26 | House | Ordered to be Reported by the Yeas and Nays: 19 - 15. |
2017-07-26 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2017-05-23 | House | Subcommittee Hearings Held. |
2017-05-16 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Federal Lands. |
2017-05-16 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources. |
2017-05-16 | House | Introduced in House |
Subjects
Land use and conservation
Public lands and natural resources
Public utilities and utility rates
Utah
Wilderness and natural areas, wildlife refuges, wild rivers, habitats
Wildlife conservation and habitat protection
Public lands and natural resources
Public utilities and utility rates
Utah
Wilderness and natural areas, wildlife refuges, wild rivers, habitats
Wildlife conservation and habitat protection