US HB2402 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Introduced on May 8 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-10-04 - Subcommittee Hearings Held.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

San Juan County Settlement Implementation Act This bill provides that if the Department of the Interior retires a coal preference right lease application under the Mineral Leasing Act by issuing a bidding right in exchange for the relinquishment of such application, such bidding right may subsequently be used in lieu of 50% of the amount owed for any monetary payment of: (1) a bonus in a coal lease sale; or (2) rental or royalty under a federal coal lease. Interior shall calculate a payment of the amounts owed to a relevant state pursuant to such Act based on the combined value of the bidding rights and the amounts received. Interior shall make such payments to a relevant state from monetary payments received by Interior when bidding rights are exercised pursuant to this bill. A bidding right issued for a coal preference right lease application under such Act shall be fully transferable to any other person. Such bidding right shall terminate seven years after it is issued. The bill cancels specified land selections made by the Navajo Nation pursuant to the Navajo-Hopi Land Settlement Act of 1974 and authorizes such nation to make land selections equal in value to those canceled, subject to an acreage cap, specified land exclusions, and a seven-year deadline.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

San Juan County Settlement Implementation Act

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-10-04HouseSubcommittee Hearings Held.
2017-05-16HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Indian, Insular and Alaska Native Affairs.
2017-05-16HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Energy and Mineral Resources.
2017-05-08HouseReferred to the House Committee on Natural Resources.
2017-05-08HouseIntroduced in House

Same As/Similar To

SB436 (Related) 2018-05-17 - Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Ordered to be reported with an amendment favorably.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback