US HB2402 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Introduced on May 8 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-10-04 - Subcommittee Hearings Held.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 8 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-10-04 - Subcommittee Hearings Held.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
San Juan County Settlement Implementation Act This bill provides that if the Department of the Interior retires a coal preference right lease application under the Mineral Leasing Act by issuing a bidding right in exchange for the relinquishment of such application, such bidding right may subsequently be used in lieu of 50% of the amount owed for any monetary payment of: (1) a bonus in a coal lease sale; or (2) rental or royalty under a federal coal lease. Interior shall calculate a payment of the amounts owed to a relevant state pursuant to such Act based on the combined value of the bidding rights and the amounts received. Interior shall make such payments to a relevant state from monetary payments received by Interior when bidding rights are exercised pursuant to this bill. A bidding right issued for a coal preference right lease application under such Act shall be fully transferable to any other person. Such bidding right shall terminate seven years after it is issued. The bill cancels specified land selections made by the Navajo Nation pursuant to the Navajo-Hopi Land Settlement Act of 1974 and authorizes such nation to make land selections equal in value to those canceled, subject to an acreage cap, specified land exclusions, and a seven-year deadline.
Title
San Juan County Settlement Implementation Act
Sponsors
Sen. Ben Lujan [D-NM] | Rep. Liz Cheney [R-WY] | Rep. Doug Lamborn [R-CO] | Rep. Scott Tipton [R-CO] |
Rep. Tom O'Halleran [D-AZ] | Rep. James Comer [R-KY] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-10-04 | House | Subcommittee Hearings Held. |
2017-05-16 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Indian, Insular and Alaska Native Affairs. |
2017-05-16 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Energy and Mineral Resources. |
2017-05-08 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources. |
2017-05-08 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB436 (Related) 2018-08-15 - By Senator Murkowski from Committee on Energy and Natural Resources filed written report. Report No. 115-318.
Subjects
Coal
Indian lands and resources rights
Land transfers
Mining
New Mexico
Public lands and natural resources
Indian lands and resources rights
Land transfers
Mining
New Mexico
Public lands and natural resources
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/115th-congress/house-bill/2402/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/115/bills/hr2402/BILLS-115hr2402ih.pdf |