US HB2399 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on May 8 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-05-08 - Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means, and in addition to the Committee on Oversight and Government Reform, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Pending: House Ways And Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 8 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-05-08 - Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means, and in addition to the Committee on Oversight and Government Reform, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Pending: House Ways And Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
LEAP Act Leveraging and Energizing America's Apprenticeship Programs Act This bill amends the Internal Revenue Code to allow employers a business-related tax credit of $1,500 for hiring an apprenticeship employee who has not attained age 25 at the close of the taxable year or $1,000 for an apprenticeship employee who has attained age 25. The bill allows such credit for no more than two taxable years with respect to any apprenticeship employee. An "apprenticeship employee" is an employee who is employed in an officially-recognized apprenticeable occupation pursuant to an apprentice agreement registered with the Office of Apprenticeship of the Employment and Training Administration of the Department of Labor or a state apprenticeship agency. The Office of Management and Budget must coordinate with federal departments and independent agencies to: (1) determine which government publications could be available on government websites and no longer printed, (2) devise a strategy to reduce overall government printing costs over the 10-year period beginning with FY2016, (3) establish government-wide guidelines on employee printing, and (4) issue guidelines for publicly disclosing information about the publication of government documents.
Title
LEAP Act Leveraging and Energizing America's Apprenticeship Programs Act
Sponsors
Rep. Rodney Davis [R-IL] | Rep. Daniel Lipinski [D-IL] | Rep. Raja Krishnamoorthi [D-IL] | Rep. Thomas MacArthur [R-NJ] |
Rep. Randy Hultgren [R-IL] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-08 | House | Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means, and in addition to the Committee on Oversight and Government Reform, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2017-05-08 | House | Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means, and in addition to the Committee on Oversight and Government Reform, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2017-05-08 | House | Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means, and in addition to the Committee on Oversight and Government Reform, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2017-05-08 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB393 (Related) 2017-02-15 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
HB3061 (Related) 2017-06-26 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
HB3628 (Related) 2017-07-28 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
HB3061 (Related) 2017-06-26 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
HB3628 (Related) 2017-07-28 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
Subjects
Congressional agencies
Employment and training programs
Executive agency funding and structure
Government information and archives
Government Publishing Office (GPO)
Income tax credits
Taxation
Employment and training programs
Executive agency funding and structure
Government information and archives
Government Publishing Office (GPO)
Income tax credits
Taxation
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/115th-congress/house-bill/2399/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/115/bills/hr2399/BILLS-115hr2399ih.pdf |