US HB239 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 77-0)
Status: Engrossed on July 12 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-07-12 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
Pending: Senate Veterans' Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Prohibits the Department of Veterans Affairs from requiring payment from a veteran for any contraceptive item that is required to be covered by health insurance plans without a cost-sharing requirement.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Equal Access to Contraception for Veterans Act Equal Access to Contraception for Veterans Act

Sponsors

Rep. Julia Brownley [D-CA]Rep. Jackie Speier [D-CA]Rep. Suzan DelBene [D-WA]Rep. Theodore Deutch [D-FL]
Rep. Barbara Lee [D-CA]Rep. Kathy Castor [D-FL]Rep. Pramila Jayapal [D-WA]Rep. Raul Grijalva [D-AZ]
Rep. Lois Frankel [D-FL]Rep. Gwen Moore [D-WI]Rep. Albio Sires [D-NJ]Rep. Eleanor Norton [D-DC]
Rep. Janice Schakowsky [D-IL]Rep. Christopher Pappas [D-NH]Rep. Diana DeGette [D-CO]Rep. Jahana Hayes [D-CT]
Rep. Steve Cohen [D-TN]Rep. Carolyn Maloney [D-NY]Rep. Judy Chu [D-CA]Rep. Jerrold Nadler [D-NY]
Rep. Ann Kuster [D-NH]Rep. Paul Tonko [D-NY]Rep. Marilyn Strickland [D-WA]Rep. Chellie Pingree [D-ME]
Rep. Sean Casten [D-IL]Rep. Nydia Velazquez [D-NY]Rep. David Price [D-NC]Rep. Yvette Clarke [D-NY]
Rep. William Keating [D-MA]Rep. Ro Khanna [D-CA]Rep. Ann Kirkpatrick [D-AZ]Rep. Sheila Jackson-Lee [D-TX]
Rep. Mondaire Jones [D-NY]Rep. Michael San Nicolas [D-GU]Rep. Chrissy Houlahan [D-PA]Rep. Adriano Espaillat [D-NY]
Rep. Brenda Lawrence [D-MI]Rep. Jim Cooper [D-TN]Rep. Joseph Morelle [D-NY]Rep. Alan Lowenthal [D-CA]
Rep. Sara Jacobs [D-CA]Rep. Earl Blumenauer [D-OR]Rep. Doris Matsui [D-CA]Rep. Anthony Brown [D-MD]
Rep. Al Lawson [D-FL]Rep. David Trone [D-MD]Rep. David Cicilline [D-RI]Rep. Tim Ryan [D-OH]
Rep. Ruben Gallego [D-AZ]Rep. Salud Carbajal [D-CA]Rep. Peter Welch [D-VT]Rep. Ayanna Pressley [D-MA]
Rep. Lisa Rochester [D-DE]Rep. Mark Pocan [D-WI]Rep. Grace Napolitano [D-CA]Rep. Jake Auchincloss [D-MA]
Rep. Suzanne Bonamici [D-OR]Rep. Alcee Hastings [D-FL]Rep. Dina Titus [D-NV]Rep. Nanette Barragan [D-CA]
Rep. Cindy Axne [D-IA]Rep. Derek Kilmer [D-WA]Rep. Eric Swalwell [D-CA]Rep. Marie Newman [D-IL]
Rep. Rick Larsen [D-WA]Rep. Jesus Garcia [D-IL]Rep. Conor Lamb [D-PA]Rep. Greg Stanton [D-AZ]
Rep. Bill Foster [D-IL]Rep. Sanford Bishop [D-GA]Rep. James Himes [D-CT]Rep. Dean Phillips [D-MN]
Rep. Ed Perlmutter [D-CO]Rep. Colin Allred [D-TX]Rep. Joseph Neguse [D-CO]Rep. Emanuel Cleaver [D-MO]
Rep. Nikema Williams [D-GA]

Roll Calls

2021-06-24 - House - On passage (Y: 245 N: 181 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-06-15 - House - On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill (Y: 240 N: 188 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-07-12SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
2021-06-24HouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
2021-06-24HouseOn passage Passed by the Yeas and Nays: 245 - 181 (Roll no. 184). (text: CR H3094)
2021-06-24HouseConsidered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H3116-3117)
2021-06-24HousePOSTPONED PROCEEDINGS - At the conclusion of debate on H. R. 239, the Chair put the question on passage of the bill and by voice vote, announced that the ayes had prevailed. Mr. Rosendale demanded the yeas and nays and the Chair postponed further proceedings on passage of the bill until a time to be announced.
2021-06-24HouseThe previous question was ordered pursuant to the rule.
2021-06-24HouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with one hour of debate on H.R. 239.
2021-06-24HouseThe resolution provides for 1 hour of debate, orders the previous question, and allows a motion to recommit for each measure. Provides that H. Res. 485 is adopted. Provides that anytime through the legislative day of June 25, 2021, the Speaker may entertain motions offered by the Majority Leader or his designee that the House suspend the rules with respect to multiple measures that were the object of motions to suspend the rules on the legislative days of June 22 or 23, and on which the yeas and nays were ordered and further proceedings postponed.
2021-06-24HouseConsidered under the provisions of rule H. Res. 486. (consideration: CR H3094-3097)
2021-06-22HouseRules Committee Resolution H. Res. 486 Reported to House. The resolution provides for 1 hour of debate, orders the previous question, and allows a motion to recommit for each measure. Provides that H. Res. 485 is adopted. Provides that anytime through the legislative day of June 25, 2021, the Speaker may entertain motions offered by the Majority Leader or his designee that the House suspend the rules with respect to multiple measures that were the object of motions to suspend the rules on the legislative days of June 22 or 23, and on which the yeas and nays were ordered and further proceedings postponed.
2021-06-15HouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
2021-06-15HouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Failed by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 240 - 188 (Roll no. 160).
2021-06-15HouseConsidered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H2799)
2021-06-15HouseAt the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
2021-06-15HouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 239.
2021-06-15HouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H2774-2775)
2021-06-15HouseMr. Takano moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
2021-06-14HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 42.
2021-06-14HouseReported by the Committee on Veterans' Affairs. H. Rept. 117-60.
2021-05-04HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
2021-05-04HouseSubcommittee on Health Discharged.
2021-05-04HouseOrdered to be Reported by the Yeas and Nays: 22 - 6.
2021-02-17HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Health.
2021-01-11HouseReferred to the House Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
2021-01-11HouseIntroduced in House

Same As/Similar To

HR486 (Related) 2021-06-23 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback