US HB2385 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on January 17 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-01-17 - Became Public Law No: 116-107. (TXT | PDF)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on January 17 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-01-17 - Became Public Law No: 116-107. (TXT | PDF)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes the Department of Veterans Affairs (VA) to establish a grant program to conduct cemetery research and produce educational materials for the Veterans Legacy Program. The program provides the public with engagement and educational opportunities regarding veterans interred in national, state, or tribal veterans' cemeteries. Additionally, the bill requires the VA to report on the efficacy of the grant program.
Title
To permit the Secretary of Veterans Affairs to establish a grant program to conduct cemetery research and produce educational materials for the Veterans Legacy Program.
Sponsors
Rep. Conor Lamb [D-PA] | Rep. Brian Fitzpatrick [R-PA] |
Roll Calls
2019-10-15 - House - On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended RC# 556 (Y: 409 N: 1 NV: 22 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-17 | House | Became Public Law No: 116-107. (TXT | PDF) |
2020-01-17 | House | Signed by President. |
2020-01-06 | House | Presented to President. |
2019-12-23 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2019-12-19 | Senate | Passed Senate without amendment by Voice Vote. |
2019-12-19 | Senate | Senate Committee on Veterans' Affairs discharged by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S7231) |
2019-10-16 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs. |
2019-10-15 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2019-10-15 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 409 - 1 (Roll no. 556). (text: CR H8129) |
2019-10-15 | House | Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H8137-8138) |
2019-10-15 | House | At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed. |
2019-10-15 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 2385. |
2019-10-15 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H8129-8130) |
2019-10-15 | House | Mr. Takano moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2019-07-24 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 138. |
2019-07-24 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Veterans' Affairs. H. Rept. 116-179. |
2019-05-08 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote. |
2019-05-08 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2019-05-06 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Disability Assistance and Memorial Affairs. |
2019-04-29 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Veterans' Affairs. |
2019-04-29 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB3039 (Related) 2019-12-12 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
Subjects
Armed forces and national security
Cemeteries and funerals
Education programs funding
Research administration and funding
Veterans' organizations and recognition
Cemeteries and funerals
Education programs funding
Research administration and funding
Veterans' organizations and recognition