US HB2379 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-10)
Status: Passed on May 23 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-23 - Became Public Law No: 116-18. (TXT | PDF)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-10)
Status: Passed on May 23 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-23 - Became Public Law No: 116-18. (TXT | PDF)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Makes permanent the authority for the Bulletproof Vest Partnership (BVP) Program. The BVP Program provides grants to states and localities to purchase body armor vests for law enforcement officers. Additionally, the bill renames the BVP Program as the Patrick Leahy Bulletproof Vest Partnership Grant Program.
Title
To reauthorize the Bulletproof Vest Partnership Grant Program.
Sponsors
Rep. Bill Pascrell [D-NJ] | Rep. Peter King [R-NY] | Rep. Val Demings [D-FL] | Rep. Doug Collins [R-GA] |
Rep. Peter Visclosky [D-IN] | Rep. Brian Fitzpatrick [R-PA] | Rep. John Rutherford [R-FL] | Rep. Jeff Van Drew [R-NJ] |
Rep. Paul Cook [R-CA] | Rep. Eleanor Norton [D-DC] | Rep. Ro Khanna [D-CA] | Rep. Katie Hill [D-CA] |
Rep. Scott Tipton [R-CO] | Rep. Gil Cisneros [D-CA] | Rep. Pete Stauber [R-MN] | Rep. Steve Cohen [D-TN] |
Rep. Josh Harder [D-CA] | Rep. Ed Perlmutter [D-CO] | Rep. Brian Higgins [D-NY] | Rep. Tim Ryan [D-OH] |
Rep. Bradley Byrne [R-AL] | Rep. Mike Quigley [D-IL] | Rep. Albio Sires [D-NJ] | Rep. Abigail Spanberger [D-VA] |
Rep. Josh Gottheimer [D-NJ] | Rep. Eric Swalwell [D-CA] | Rep. Steve Chabot [R-OH] |
Roll Calls
2019-05-14 - House - On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended RC# 204 (Y: 400 N: 9 NV: 22 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-23 | House | Became Public Law No: 116-18. (TXT | PDF) |
2019-05-23 | House | Signed by President. |
2019-05-20 | House | Presented to President. |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Passed Senate without amendment by Voice Vote. (consideration: CR S2901) |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Received in the Senate, read twice. |
2019-05-14 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2019-05-14 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 400 - 9 (Roll no. 204). (text: CR H3751) |
2019-05-14 | House | Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H3771-3772) |
2019-05-14 | House | At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed. |
2019-05-14 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 2379. |
2019-05-14 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H3751-3755) |
2019-05-14 | House | Mr. Johnson (GA) moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2019-04-29 | House | Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary. |
2019-04-29 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB1231 (Same As) 2019-05-15 - Held at the desk.
HB4163 (Related) 2019-09-25 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
HB4163 (Related) 2019-09-25 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
Subjects
Crime and law enforcement
Law enforcement administration and funding
Law enforcement officers
Worker safety and health
Law enforcement administration and funding
Law enforcement officers
Worker safety and health