US HB2376 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on May 4 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-05-05 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 4 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-05-05 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Drug Diversion and Counterfeit Crackdown Act of 2017
Title
Drug Diversion and Counterfeit Crackdown Act of 2017
Sponsors
Rep. Leonard Lance [R-NJ] | Rep. Debbie Dingell [D-MI] | Rep. Michael Burgess [R-TX] | Rep. Gene Green [D-TX] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-05 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2017-05-04 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce. |
2017-05-04 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB2430 (Related) 2017-08-18 - Became Public Law No: 115-52. (TXT | PDF)
SB934 (Related) 2017-05-11 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 76.
SB934 (Related) 2017-05-11 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 76.
Subjects
Consumer affairs
Drug safety, medical device, and laboratory regulation
Drug trafficking and controlled substances
Fraud offenses and financial crimes
Health
Manufacturing
Drug safety, medical device, and laboratory regulation
Drug trafficking and controlled substances
Fraud offenses and financial crimes
Health
Manufacturing
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/115th-congress/house-bill/2376/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/115/bills/hr2376/BILLS-115hr2376ih.pdf |