US HB2375 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-4)
Status: Introduced on May 4 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-05-05 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Aviation.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Aviation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 4 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-05-05 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Aviation.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Aviation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Friendly Airports for Mothers Act of 2017 This bill authorizes the Department of Transportation (DOT) to approve a grant application for an airport development project only if the DOT receives written assurances that the owner or operator of a large or medium hub airport will maintain a lactation area at each passenger terminal building of the airport behind the airport security screening area. The bill defines "lactation area" to mean a room or other location in a commercial service airport for members of the public to express breast milk that: is shielded from view and free from intrusion from the public; has a door that can be locked; includes a place to sit, a table or other flat surface, and an electrical outlet; is readily accessible to and usable by individuals with disabilities; and is not located in a restroom. DOT may approve a terminal development project for the construction or installation of a lactation area at a commercial service airport.
Title
Friendly Airports for Mothers Act of 2017
Sponsors
Rep. Stephen Knight [R-CA] | Rep. Jaime Herrera Beutler [R-WA] | Rep. Barbara Comstock [R-VA] | Rep. Susan Brooks [R-IN] |
Rep. Cheri Bustos [D-IL] | Rep. Daniel Lipinski [D-IL] | Rep. Norma Torres [D-CA] | Sen. Peter Welch [D-VT] |
Rep. David Price [D-NC] | Rep. Gerald Connolly [D-VA] | Rep. Carol Shea-Porter [D-NH] | Rep. Alcee Hastings [D-FL] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-05 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Aviation. |
2017-05-04 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure. |
2017-05-04 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB1110 (Same As) 2017-05-11 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
SB1405 (Related) 2018-05-09 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 407.
HB2997 (Related) 2017-09-06 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 213.
SB1405 (Related) 2018-05-09 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 407.
HB2997 (Related) 2017-09-06 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 213.
Subjects
Aviation and airports
Child health
Disability and paralysis
Right of privacy
Transportation and public works
Transportation programs funding
Women's health
Child health
Disability and paralysis
Right of privacy
Transportation and public works
Transportation programs funding
Women's health
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/115th-congress/house-bill/2375/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/115/bills/hr2375/BILLS-115hr2375ih.pdf |