US HB2372 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on October 20 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-10-20 - Became Public Law No: 116-177. (TXT | PDF)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on October 20 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-10-20 - Became Public Law No: 116-177. (TXT | PDF)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Requires the Government Accountability Office to report on all memoranda of understanding and memoranda of agreement entered into by the Department of Veterans Affairs (VA) with non-VA entities relating to suicide prevention and the provision or coordination of mental health services.
Title
Veterans' Care Quality Transparency Act
Sponsors
Rep. Lauren Underwood [D-IL] | Rep. Katie Porter [D-CA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-10-20 | House | Became Public Law No: 116-177. (TXT | PDF) |
2020-10-20 | House | Signed by President. |
2020-10-09 | House | Presented to President. |
2020-09-29 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2020-09-24 | Senate | Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S5881) |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Received in the Senate, read twice. |
2019-05-21 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2019-05-21 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H4043-4044) |
2019-05-21 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 2372. |
2019-05-21 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H4043-4045) |
2019-05-21 | House | Mr. Takano moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2019-05-17 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 48. |
2019-05-17 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Veterans' Affairs. H. Rept. 116-72. |
2019-05-08 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote. |
2019-05-08 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2019-05-02 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2019-04-25 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Veterans' Affairs. |
2019-04-25 | House | Introduced in House |
Subjects
Armed forces and national security
Congressional oversight
Government ethics and transparency, public corruption
Government information and archives
Government studies and investigations
Health promotion and preventive care
Mental health
Veterans' medical care
Congressional oversight
Government ethics and transparency, public corruption
Government information and archives
Government studies and investigations
Health promotion and preventive care
Mental health
Veterans' medical care