US HB237 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-4)
Status: Introduced on January 3 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-12-28 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 857.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 3 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-12-28 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 857.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Integrated Coastal and Ocean Observation System Act Amendments of 2018 This bill reauthorizes through FY2022 and revises the Integrated Coastal and Ocean Observation System Act of 2009.
Title
Integrated Coastal and Ocean Observation System Act Amendments of 2018
Sponsors
Rep. Don Young [R-AK] | Rep. Madeleine Bordallo [D-GU] | Rep. Colleen Hanabusa [D-HI] | Rep. Derek Kilmer [D-WA] |
Rep. Denny Heck [D-WA] | Rep. David Price [D-NC] | Rep. Marcy Kaptur [D-OH] | Rep. Suzanne Bonamici [D-OR] |
Rep. Jenniffer Gonzalez-Colon [R-PR] | Rep. Debbie Dingell [D-MI] | Rep. Bill Posey [R-FL] | Rep. Anna Eshoo [D-CA] |
Rep. Scott Peters [D-CA] | Rep. Salud Carbajal [D-CA] | Rep. Ted Lieu [D-CA] | Rep. Rick Larsen [D-WA] |
Rep. John Garamendi [D-CA] | Rep. Bruce Poliquin [R-ME] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-12-28 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 857. |
2018-12-28 | House | Committee on Science, Space, and Technology discharged. |
2018-11-20 | House | House Committee on Science, Space, and Technology Granted an extension for further consideration ending not later than Dec. 28, 2018. |
2018-11-20 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 115-1038, Part I. |
2018-09-27 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Unanimous Consent. |
2018-09-27 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2018-09-27 | House | Subcommittee on Water, Power and Oceans Discharged. |
2017-04-25 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Environment. |
2017-02-10 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Water, Power and Oceans. |
2017-01-03 | House | Referred to the Committee on Natural Resources, and in addition to the Committee on Science, Space, and Technology, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2017-01-03 | House | Referred to the Committee on Natural Resources, and in addition to the Committee on Science, Space, and Technology, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2017-01-03 | House | Referred to the Committee on Natural Resources, and in addition to the Committee on Science, Space, and Technology, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2017-01-03 | House | Introduced in House |
Subjects
Advisory bodies
Appropriations
Atmospheric science and weather
Department of Commerce
Environmental assessment, monitoring, research
Executive agency funding and structure
Marine and coastal resources, fisheries
Public lands and natural resources
Appropriations
Atmospheric science and weather
Department of Commerce
Environmental assessment, monitoring, research
Executive agency funding and structure
Marine and coastal resources, fisheries
Public lands and natural resources