US HB2364 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on July 25 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2017-07-25 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.
Pending: Senate Banking, Housing, And Urban Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Investing in Main Street Act of 2017 (Sec. 2) This bill amends the Small Business Investment Act of 1958 to increase from 5% to 15% of its capital and surplus, the amount a national bank, a member bank of the Federal Reserve System, a nonmember insured bank (to the extent permitted under applicable state law), or a federal savings association may invest in one or more small business investment companies (SBICs), or in any entity established to invest solely in SBICs. The increase is subject to the approval of the appropriate federal banking agency.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Investing in Main Street Act of 2017

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-07-25SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.
2017-07-24HouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
2017-07-24HouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H6181-6182)
2017-07-24HouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 2364.
2017-07-24HouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H6181-6183)
2017-07-24HouseMr. Chabot moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
2017-07-12HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 152.
2017-07-12HouseReported by the Committee on Small Business. H. Rept. 115-216.
2017-06-15HouseOrdered to be Reported.
2017-06-15HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
2017-05-04HouseReferred to the House Committee on Small Business.
2017-05-04HouseIntroduced in House

Same As/Similar To

HB5515 (Related) 2018-07-11 - Message on Senate action sent to the House.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback