US HB233 | 2015-2016 | 114th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 24 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-24 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.
Pending: Senate Banking, Housing, And Urban Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 24 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-24 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.
Pending: Senate Banking, Housing, And Urban Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Tenant Income Verification Relief Act of 2015 Amends the United States Housing Act of 1937 with respect to annual review of low-income families' income for eligibility requirements for certain federal assisted housing programs. Prohibits, after the initial review of any family's fix income, the public housing agency (PHA) or owner from being required to review its income for any year for which the family certifies, in accordance with specified requirements as the Secretary of Housing and Urban Development shall establish. Requires the PHA or owner to review each such family's income at least once every three years. Requires PHAs to also review a family's income receiving Section 8 (rental assistance voucher program) at least once every three years (currently, at least annually).
Title
Tenant Income Verification Relief Act of 2015
Sponsors
Rep. Ed Perlmutter [D-CO] | Rep. Steve Stivers [R-OH] | Rep. Frank Guinta [R-NH] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-24 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs. |
2015-03-23 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2015-03-23 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H1812) |
2015-03-23 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 233. |
2015-03-23 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H1812-1814) |
2015-03-23 | House | Mr. Stivers moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill. |
2015-01-08 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Financial Services. |
2015-01-08 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB22 (Related) 2015-12-04 - Became Public Law No: 114-94. (TXT | PDF)