US HB2319 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 45-28-1)
Status: Introduced on May 3 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-08-24 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 699.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 3 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-08-24 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 699.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Consumer Financial Choice and Capital Markets Protection Act of 2018 This bill amends the Investment Company Act of 1940 to allow a money market fund, under specified conditions, to elect to operate using a different method of valuation than is otherwise required. Under specified conditions, a money market fund shall not be subject to certain requirements related to the imposition of liquidity fees. Certain federal assistance may not be provided directly to any money market fund. This limitation on federal assistance must be disclosed in a money market fund's advertising and sales literature.
Title
Consumer Financial Choice and Capital Markets Protection Act of 2018
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-08-24 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 699. |
2018-08-24 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Financial Services. H. Rept. 115-903. |
2018-01-18 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by the Yeas and Nays: 34 - 21. |
2018-01-18 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2018-01-17 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2017-11-03 | House | Hearings Held by the Subcommittee on Capital Markets Prior to Referral. |
2017-05-03 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Financial Services. |
2017-05-03 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB1117 (Same As) 2018-06-26 - Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs. Hearings held.
Subjects
Bank accounts, deposits, capital
Consumer affairs
Finance and financial sector
Financial crises and stabilization
Financial services and investments
Government lending and loan guarantees
Securities
Consumer affairs
Finance and financial sector
Financial crises and stabilization
Financial services and investments
Government lending and loan guarantees
Securities