US HB2313 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-2)
Status: Introduced on April 12 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-12 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
Pending: House Ways And Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 12 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-12 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
Pending: House Ways And Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Expands the tax exclusion for energy conservation subsidies provided by public utilities to include certain subsidies for water conservation or efficiency measures and storm water management measures. The bill excludes from gross income subsidies provided (directly or indirectly) (1) by a public utility to a customer, or by a state or local government to a resident of such state or locality, for the purchase or installation of any water conservation or efficiency measure; and (2) by a storm water management provider to a customer, or by a state or local government to a resident of such state or locality, for the purchase or installation of any storm water management measure.
Title
Water Conservation Rebate Tax Parity Act
Sponsors
Rep. Jared Huffman [D-CA] | Rep. Paul Gosar [R-AZ] | Rep. Adam Schiff [D-CA] | Rep. Barbara Lee [D-CA] |
Rep. Eleanor Norton [D-DC] | Rep. Jamie Raskin [D-MD] | Rep. Eric Swalwell [D-CA] | Rep. Grace Napolitano [D-CA] |
Rep. Julia Brownley [D-CA] | Rep. Dina Titus [D-NV] | Rep. Raul Grijalva [D-AZ] | Rep. Glenn Grothman [R-WI] |
Rep. Ann Kirkpatrick [D-AZ] | Rep. Alan Lowenthal [D-CA] | Rep. Raul Ruiz [D-CA] | Rep. Gwen Moore [D-WI] |
Rep. Ed Perlmutter [D-CO] | Rep. Mike Levin [D-CA] | Rep. Mark Pocan [D-WI] | Rep. Mark Takano [D-CA] |
Rep. Jimmy Panetta [D-CA] | Rep. Judy Chu [D-CA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-12 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means. |
2019-04-12 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB2 (Related) 2020-07-20 - Received in the Senate.
HB7330 (Related) 2020-06-25 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
HB8885 (Related) 2020-12-07 - Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means, and in addition to the Committees on Oversight and Reform, and Energy and Commerce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
HB7330 (Related) 2020-06-25 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
HB8885 (Related) 2020-12-07 - Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means, and in addition to the Committees on Oversight and Reform, and Energy and Commerce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Subjects
Energy efficiency and conservation
Income tax exclusion
Public utilities and utility rates
Taxation
Water use and supply
Income tax exclusion
Public utilities and utility rates
Taxation
Water use and supply
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-bill/2313/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hr2313/BILLS-116hr2313ih.pdf |