US HB23 | 2011-2012 | 112th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 71-18)
Status: Introduced on January 5 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-02-18 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Disability Assistance and Memorial Affairs.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Disability Assistance and Memorial Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 5 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-02-18 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Disability Assistance and Memorial Affairs.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Disability Assistance and Memorial Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Belated Thank You to the Merchant Mariners of World War II Act of 2011 - Establishes in the Treasury the Merchant Mariner Equity Compensation Fund for payments by the Secretary of Veterans Affairs (VA) of a monthly benefit of $1,000 to each individual who, between December 7, 1941, and December 31, 1946, was a documented member of the U.S. merchant marine (including the Army Transport Service and the Naval Transport Service) serving as a crewmember of a vessel that was operated in U.S. waters by the War Shipping Administration or the Office of Defense Transportation and under contract to, or the property of, the United States. Requires such individuals to: (1) apply for such benefit within one year after the enactment of this Act; and (2) not have received benefits under the Servicemen's Readjustment Act of 1944. Requires the Secretary to include, in annual budget documents submitted to Congress, detailed information on the Fund's operation.
Title
Belated Thank You to the Merchant Mariners of World War II Act of 2011
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-02-18 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Disability Assistance and Memorial Affairs. |
2011-01-05 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Veterans' Affairs. |
2011-01-05 | House | Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR E1) |
Subjects
Armed forces and national security
Conflicts and wars
Government trust funds
Marine and inland water transportation
Transportation employees
Veterans' pensions and compensation
Conflicts and wars
Government trust funds
Marine and inland water transportation
Transportation employees
Veterans' pensions and compensation
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/112th-congress/house-bill/23/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/112/bills/hr23/BILLS-112hr23ih.pdf |