US HB2288 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-3)
Status: Introduced on April 10 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-30 - Subcommittee Hearings Held.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 10 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-30 - Subcommittee Hearings Held.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Increases the maximum amount of funding that may be authorized for the Erie Canalway National Heritage Corridor in the state of New York.
Title
Erie Canalway National Heritage Corridor Reauthorization Act
Sponsors
Rep. Paul Tonko [D-NY] | Rep. Brian Higgins [D-NY] | Rep. Chris Collins [R-NY] | Rep. Joseph Morelle [D-NY] |
Rep. Jerrold Nadler [D-NY] | Rep. Adriano Espaillat [D-NY] | Rep. Antonio Delgado [D-NY] | Rep. Eliot Engel [D-NY] |
Rep. Thomas Suozzi [D-NY] | Rep. Sean Maloney [D-NY] | Rep. Anthony Brindisi [D-NY] | Rep. John Katko [R-NY] |
Rep. Jose Serrano [D-NY] | Rep. Alexandria Ocasio-Cortez [D-NY] | Rep. Grace Meng [D-NY] | Rep. Yvette Clarke [D-NY] |
Rep. Nydia Velazquez [D-NY] | Rep. Kathleen Rice [D-NY] | Rep. Elise Stefanik [R-NY] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-30 | House | Subcommittee Hearings Held. |
2019-04-22 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests, and Public Lands. |
2019-04-10 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources. |
2019-04-10 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB2500 (Related) 2020-08-11 - Read twice. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 512.
SB1790 (Related) 2019-12-20 - Became Public Law No: 116-92. (TXT | PDF)
HR758 (Similar To) 2019-12-11 - Mr. Nadler moved to table the motion to reconsider
SB2952 (Related) 2019-11-21 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
SB1790 (Related) 2019-12-20 - Became Public Law No: 116-92. (TXT | PDF)
HR758 (Similar To) 2019-12-11 - Mr. Nadler moved to table the motion to reconsider
SB2952 (Related) 2019-11-21 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
Subjects
Appropriations
Dams and canals
Department of the Interior
Executive agency funding and structure
Historic sites and heritage areas
New York State
Public lands and natural resources
Dams and canals
Department of the Interior
Executive agency funding and structure
Historic sites and heritage areas
New York State
Public lands and natural resources
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-bill/2288/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hr2288/BILLS-116hr2288ih.pdf |