US HB2288 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 23 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-23 - Became Public Law No: 115-55. (TXT | PDF)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 23 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-23 - Became Public Law No: 115-55. (TXT | PDF)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Veterans Appeals Improvement and Modernization Act of 2017 This bill revises the Department of Veterans Affairs (VA) disability claims appeals system. The bill permits a veteran to appeal within one year by: (1) requesting a review of the agency of original jurisdiction's (AOJ) decision by a higher-level adjudicator within AOJ using the same evidentiary record; (2) filing a supplemental claim with a regional office that includes the opportunity to submit additional evidence and have a hearing; or (3) appealing directly to the Board of Veterans' Appeals, with the opportunity to select an expedited review to submit new evidence but without a hearing, or to select a review with the option to submit new evidence and request a hearing. A veteran may: (1) maintain the original effective date of a claim if he or she submits new and relevant evidence within one year of the most recent decision, and (2) retain the services of attorneys and accredited agents who charge a fee when the AOJ provides notice of the original decision. The VA's statutory duty to assist a veteran terminates after the original decision. The bill: (1) requires the VA to issue decision notification letters, (2) permits certain veterans who initiated an appeal prior to the bill's effective date to opt-in to the modernized appeals system, (3) authorizes the VA to conduct a pilot program to test such system, and (4) requires the VA, prior to full implementation, to certify to Congress that it has sufficient resources and personnel to carry out the legacy and modernized appeals systems.
Title
Veterans Appeals Improvement and Modernization Act of 2017
Sponsors
Rep. Mike Bost [R-IL] | Rep. Elizabeth Esty [D-CT] | Rep. David Roe [R-TN] | Rep. Timothy Walz [D-MN] |
Rep. Gus Bilirakis [R-FL] | Rep. Mark Takano [D-CA] | Rep. Mike Coffman [R-CO] | Rep. Julia Brownley [D-CA] |
Rep. Brad Wenstrup [R-OH] | Rep. Ann Kuster [D-NH] | Rep. Amata Radewagen [R-AS] | Rep. Beto O'Rourke [D-TX] |
Rep. Bruce Poliquin [R-ME] | Rep. Kathleen Rice [D-NY] | Rep. Neal Dunn [R-FL] | Rep. Luis Correa [D-CA] |
Rep. Jody Arrington [R-TX] | Rep. Gregorio Sablan [D-MP] | Rep. John Rutherford [R-FL] | Rep. Scott Peters [D-CA] |
Rep. Clay Higgins [R-LA] | Rep. Jack Bergman [R-MI] | Rep. Jim Banks [R-IN] | Rep. Jenniffer Gonzalez-Colon [R-PR] |
Rep. Dina Titus [D-NV] | Rep. Ryan Costello [R-PA] | Rep. Earl Carter [R-GA] |
Roll Calls
2017-05-23 - House - On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended RC# 273 (Y: 418 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-08-23 | Senate | Became Public Law No: 115-55. (TXT | PDF) |
2017-08-23 | Senate | Signed by President. |
2017-08-11 | Senate | Presented to President. |
2017-08-11 | Senate | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2017-08-11 | Senate | On motion that the House agree to the Senate amendment Agreed to without objection. (consideration: CR H6595-6601; text as House agreed to Senate amendment: CR H6595-6601) |
2017-08-11 | Senate | Mrs. Comstock asked unanimous consent to take from the Speaker's Table and agree to the Senate amendment. |
2017-08-02 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2017-08-01 | Senate | Passed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent. |
2017-08-01 | Senate | S.Amdt.745 Amendment SA 745 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent. |
2017-08-01 | Senate | S.Amdt.745 Amendment SA 745 proposed by Senator Portman for Senator Isakson. (consideration: CR S4687; text: CR S4674-4680) In the nature of a substitute. |
2017-08-01 | Senate | Measure laid before Senate by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR S4687) |
2017-08-01 | Senate | Senate Committee on Veterans' Affairs discharged by Unanimous Consent. |
2017-05-24 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs. |
2017-05-23 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2017-05-23 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 418 - 0 (Roll no. 273). (text: CR H4457-4463) |
2017-05-23 | House | Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H4483) |
2017-05-23 | House | At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed. |
2017-05-23 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 2288. |
2017-05-23 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H4457-4466) |
2017-05-23 | House | Mr. Roe (TN) moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2017-05-19 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 84. |
2017-05-19 | House | Reported by the Committee on Veterans' Affairs. H. Rept. 115-135. |
2017-05-17 | House | Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote. |
2017-05-17 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2017-05-02 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Veterans' Affairs. |
2017-05-02 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB1024 (Related) 2017-07-10 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 166.
Subjects
Administrative remedies
Armed forces and national security
Computers and information technology
Congressional oversight
Department of Veterans Affairs
Evidence and witnesses
Government employee pay, benefits, personnel management
Government information and archives
Government studies and investigations
Health information and medical records
Medical tests and diagnostic methods
Performance measurement
Personnel records
Veterans' pensions and compensation
Armed forces and national security
Computers and information technology
Congressional oversight
Department of Veterans Affairs
Evidence and witnesses
Government employee pay, benefits, personnel management
Government information and archives
Government studies and investigations
Health information and medical records
Medical tests and diagnostic methods
Performance measurement
Personnel records
Veterans' pensions and compensation