US HB2288 | 2009-2010 | 111th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-4)
Status: Engrossed on May 19 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-05-19 - Received in the Senate. Read twice. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 399.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 19 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-05-19 - Received in the Senate. Read twice. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 399.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Endangered Fish Recovery Programs Improvement Act of 2010 - Authorizes appropriations for FY2012-FY2023 to provide for the annual base funding for the intergovernmental recovery implementation program for the endangered fish species in the Upper Colorado River and the San Juan River, above and beyond the continued use of power revenues collected under the Colorado River Storage Project Act to fund the operation and maintenance of capital projects and monitoring.
Title
Endangered Fish Recovery Programs Improvement Act of 2010
Sponsors
Rep. Rob Bishop [R-UT] | Rep. Jason Chaffetz [R-UT] | Rep. Mike Coffman [R-CO] | Rep. Diana DeGette [D-CO] |
Sen. Martin Heinrich [D-NM] | Sen. Ben Lujan [D-NM] | Sen. Cynthia Lummis [R-WY] | Rep. Betsy Markey [D-CO] |
Rep. Jim Matheson [D-UT] | Rep. Ed Perlmutter [D-CO] | Rep. Jared Polis [D-CO] | Rep. John Salazar [D-CO] |
Rep. Harry Teague [D-NM] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-19 | Received in the Senate. Read twice. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 399. | |
2010-05-18 | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. | |
2010-05-18 | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 264 - 122 (Roll no. 273). (text: CR H3489) | |
2010-05-18 | Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H3512) | |
2010-05-18 | At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed. | |
2010-05-18 | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 2288. | |
2010-05-18 | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H3489-3491) | |
2010-05-18 | Mrs. Napolitano moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. | |
2010-05-18 | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 272. | |
2010-05-18 | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 111-481. | |
2009-12-16 | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote. | |
2009-12-16 | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. | |
2009-12-16 | Subcommittee on Water and Power Discharged. | |
2009-09-22 | Subcommittee Hearings Held. | |
2009-05-11 | Referred to the Subcommittee on Water and Power. | |
2009-05-06 | Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources. | |
2009-05-06 | Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR E1074) |
Same As/Similar To
SB1453 (Related) 2010-03-02 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 292.
Subjects
Animals
Arizona
Colorado
Endangered and threatened species
Energy revenues and royalties
Fishes
Lakes and rivers
New Mexico
Utah
Water use and supply
Wildlife conservation and habitat protection
Wyoming
Arizona
Colorado
Endangered and threatened species
Energy revenues and royalties
Fishes
Lakes and rivers
New Mexico
Utah
Water use and supply
Wildlife conservation and habitat protection
Wyoming