US HB2284 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Introduced on May 2 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-05-11 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Federal Lands.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Federal Lands Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 2 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-05-11 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Federal Lands.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Federal Lands Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
National Monument Designation Transparency and Accountability Act This bill requires the President, before a national monument can be designated on public land, to obtain congressional approval, certify compliance with the National Environmental Policy Act of 1969, and determine that the state in which the monument is to be located has enacted legislation approving its designation. The Department of the Interior may not implement restrictions on the public use of a national monument until the expiration of an appropriate review period providing for public input and congressional approval.
Title
National Monument Designation Transparency and Accountability Act
Sponsors
Rep. Raul Labrador [R-ID] | Rep. Stevan Pearce [R-NM] | Rep. Jody Hice [R-GA] | Rep. Doug LaMalfa [R-CA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-11 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Federal Lands. |
2017-05-02 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources. |
2017-05-02 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB132 (Related) 2017-01-12 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
SB33 (Related) 2017-01-05 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
SB33 (Related) 2017-01-05 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
Subjects
Congressional oversight
Environmental assessment, monitoring, research
Land use and conservation
Monuments and memorials
Parks, recreation areas, trails
Presidents and presidential powers, Vice Presidents
Public lands and natural resources
Wilderness and natural areas, wildlife refuges, wild rivers, habitats
Environmental assessment, monitoring, research
Land use and conservation
Monuments and memorials
Parks, recreation areas, trails
Presidents and presidential powers, Vice Presidents
Public lands and natural resources
Wilderness and natural areas, wildlife refuges, wild rivers, habitats
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/115th-congress/house-bill/2284/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/115/bills/hr2284/BILLS-115hr2284ih.pdf |