US HB2274 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on April 10 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-20 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 10 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-20 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Directs the Department of Veterans Affairs (VA) to establish a veterans conservation corps to assist unemployed veterans in the transition from military service to civilian life. Specifically, the VA and other specified federal agencies must employ such veterans (1) in conservation, resource management, firefighting, law enforcement, and historic preservation projects on public lands; (2) in maintenance and improvement projects for the National Cemetery Administration; and (3) as firefighters, law enforcement officers, and disaster relief personnel.
Title
Veterans Conservation Corps Act of 2019
Sponsors
Rep. Joseph Neguse [D-CO] | Rep. Raul Ruiz [D-CA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-20 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security. |
2019-05-02 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Opportunity. |
2019-04-11 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Water Resources and Environment. |
2019-04-11 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings, and Emergency Management. |
2019-04-10 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Research and Technology. |
2019-04-10 | House | Referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs, and in addition to the Committees on Transportation and Infrastructure, the Judiciary, and Science, Space, and Technology, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-04-10 | House | Referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs, and in addition to the Committees on Transportation and Infrastructure, the Judiciary, and Science, Space, and Technology, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-04-10 | House | Referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs, and in addition to the Committees on Transportation and Infrastructure, the Judiciary, and Science, Space, and Technology, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-04-10 | House | Referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs, and in addition to the Committees on Transportation and Infrastructure, the Judiciary, and Science, Space, and Technology, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-04-10 | House | Introduced in House |
Subjects
Armed forces and national security
Army Corps of Engineers
Cemeteries and funerals
Corporation for National and Community Service
Department of Agriculture
Department of Homeland Security
Department of the Interior
Disaster relief and insurance
Federal Emergency Management Agency (FEMA)
Fires
First responders and emergency personnel
Government employee pay, benefits, personnel management
Historic sites and heritage areas
Land use and conservation
Law enforcement administration and funding
Law enforcement officers
National and community service
Veterans' education, employment, rehabilitation
Army Corps of Engineers
Cemeteries and funerals
Corporation for National and Community Service
Department of Agriculture
Department of Homeland Security
Department of the Interior
Disaster relief and insurance
Federal Emergency Management Agency (FEMA)
Fires
First responders and emergency personnel
Government employee pay, benefits, personnel management
Historic sites and heritage areas
Land use and conservation
Law enforcement administration and funding
Law enforcement officers
National and community service
Veterans' education, employment, rehabilitation
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-bill/2274/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hr2274/BILLS-116hr2274ih.pdf |