US HB2268 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-0)
Status: Introduced on April 10 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-11 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 10 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-11 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To amend the Federal Food, Drug, and Cosmetic Act to treat certain menstrual products as misbranded if their labeling does not list each ingredient or component of the product, and for other purposes.
Title
Menstrual Products Right To Know Act of 2019
Sponsors
Rep. Grace Meng [D-NY] | Rep. Raul Grijalva [D-AZ] | Rep. Alcee Hastings [D-FL] | Rep. Jerrold Nadler [D-NY] |
Rep. Zoe Lofgren [D-CA] | Rep. Robin Kelly [D-IL] | Rep. Betty McCollum [D-MN] | Rep. Carolyn Maloney [D-NY] |
Rep. Lucille Roybal-Allard [D-CA] | Rep. Nydia Velazquez [D-NY] | Rep. Eleanor Norton [D-DC] | Rep. Grace Napolitano [D-CA] |
Rep. Gwen Moore [D-WI] | Rep. Sanford Bishop [D-GA] | Rep. Suzan DelBene [D-WA] | Rep. Debbie Dingell [D-MI] |
Rep. Sylvia Garcia [D-TX] | Rep. David Cicilline [D-RI] | Rep. Julia Brownley [D-CA] | Rep. Joyce Beatty [D-OH] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-11 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2019-04-10 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce. |
2019-04-10 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB5986 (Related) 2020-10-01 - Committee Hearings Held.
SB4401 (Related) 2020-08-03 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works.
SB4401 (Related) 2020-08-03 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works.
Subjects
Administrative law and regulatory procedures
Drug safety, medical device, and laboratory regulation
Health
Health technology, devices, supplies
Sex and reproductive health
Women's health
Drug safety, medical device, and laboratory regulation
Health
Health technology, devices, supplies
Sex and reproductive health
Women's health
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-bill/2268/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hr2268/BILLS-116hr2268ih.pdf |