US HB2261 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-4)
Status: Introduced on May 1 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-22 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Environment.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Environment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 1 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-22 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Environment.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Environment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Marine Oil Spill Prevention Act This bill address issues related to preventing and responding to oil spills. This bill amends the Gulf of Mexico Energy Security Act of 2006 to extend the moratorium on oil and gas leasing in certain areas in the Gulf of Mexico until June 30, 2027. This bill sets forth provisions concerning Coast Guard responsibilities, including designating areas that are at heightened risk of oil spills and implementing measures to ameliorate that risk. This bill amends the Oil Pollution Act of 1990 to establish a Gulf Coast Regional Citizens' Advisory Council to advise on facilities and tank vessels. This bill makes an owner of oil responsible for oil spill cleanup. Currently, owners of oil are only responsible if the oil is being transported in a single-hull vessel. This bill amends the Outer Continental Shelf Lands Act to permit the Coast Guard or the Department of Commerce to request a National Transportation Safety Board investigation of any accident occurring in the Outer Continental Shelf (OCS). Commerce must establish an inspection fee for OCS facilities for the cost of inspections of facilities and other duties. This bill requires a comprehensive review of the capacity of the National Oceanic and Atmospheric Administration (NOAA) to respond to oil spills. NOAA must develop and maintain oil spill trajectory modeling capability. The Coast Guard must evaluate and validate oil pollution containment and removal methods and technologies. NOAA must carry out long-term marine environment monitoring and research program for the Gulf of Mexico. The bill requires the Coast Guard to publish within 12 hours an Incident Action Plan in response to an oil spill.
Title
Marine Oil Spill Prevention Act
Sponsors
Rep. Debbie Wasserman Schultz [D-FL] | Rep. Vern Buchanan [R-FL] | Rep. Charlie Crist [D-FL] | Rep. Val Demings [D-FL] |
Rep. Theodore Deutch [D-FL] | Rep. Dwight Evans [D-PA] | Rep. Raul Grijalva [D-AZ] | Rep. Luis Gutierrez [D-IL] |
Rep. Alcee Hastings [D-FL] | Rep. Jared Huffman [D-CA] | Rep. Al Lawson [D-FL] | Rep. Brian Mast [R-FL] |
Rep. Stephanie Murphy [D-FL] | Rep. Darren Soto [D-FL] | Rep. Frederica Wilson [D-FL] | Rep. Lois Frankel [D-FL] |
Rep. Ro Khanna [D-CA] | Rep. Francis Rooney [R-FL] | Rep. Matt Gaetz [R-FL] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-22 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Environment. |
2017-05-16 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Energy and Mineral Resources. |
2017-05-16 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Water, Power and Oceans. |
2017-05-02 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Coast Guard and Maritime Transportation. |
2017-05-02 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Water Resources and Environment. |
2017-05-01 | House | Referred to the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure, and in addition to the Committees on Natural Resources, and Science, Space, and Technology, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2017-05-01 | House | Referred to the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure, and in addition to the Committees on Natural Resources, and Science, Space, and Technology, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2017-05-01 | House | Referred to the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure, and in addition to the Committees on Natural Resources, and Science, Space, and Technology, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2017-05-01 | House | Referred to the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure, and in addition to the Committees on Natural Resources, and Science, Space, and Technology, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2017-05-01 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB74 (Related) 2017-01-09 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
Subjects
Accidents
Advisory bodies
Alabama
Aquaculture
Aquatic ecology
Coast guard
Congressional oversight
Department of Commerce
Emergency planning and evacuation
Environmental assessment, monitoring, research
Environmental protection
Environmental technology
Florida
Government information and archives
Government studies and investigations
Government trust funds
Gulf of Mexico
Hunting and fishing
Intergovernmental relations
Louisiana
Marine and coastal resources, fisheries
Marine and inland water transportation
Marine pollution
Mississippi
Navigation, waterways, harbors
Oil and gas
Parks, recreation areas, trails
Pollution liability
Research administration and funding
Research and development
Seafood
State and local government operations
Technology assessment
Texas
Transportation safety and security
Travel and tourism
Water quality
Wilderness and natural areas, wildlife refuges, wild rivers, habitats
Wildlife conservation and habitat protection
Advisory bodies
Alabama
Aquaculture
Aquatic ecology
Coast guard
Congressional oversight
Department of Commerce
Emergency planning and evacuation
Environmental assessment, monitoring, research
Environmental protection
Environmental technology
Florida
Government information and archives
Government studies and investigations
Government trust funds
Gulf of Mexico
Hunting and fishing
Intergovernmental relations
Louisiana
Marine and coastal resources, fisheries
Marine and inland water transportation
Marine pollution
Mississippi
Navigation, waterways, harbors
Oil and gas
Parks, recreation areas, trails
Pollution liability
Research administration and funding
Research and development
Seafood
State and local government operations
Technology assessment
Texas
Transportation safety and security
Travel and tourism
Water quality
Wilderness and natural areas, wildlife refuges, wild rivers, habitats
Wildlife conservation and habitat protection
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/115th-congress/house-bill/2261/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/115/bills/hr2261/BILLS-115hr2261ih.pdf |