US HB2261 | 2015-2016 | 114th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Introduced on May 12 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-09-28 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 619.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 12 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-09-28 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 619.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Commercial Remote Sensing Act of 2015 (Sec. 2) This bill directs the Department of Commerce to report annually to the House Committee on Science, Space, and Technology and the Senate Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation on: (1) the implementation of its authority to license private entities to operate private remote sensing space systems; (2) all notifications and information provided to Commerce by licensees; and (3) all administrative actions taken to adjust penalties for violations of licensing requirements, issue subpoenas, and seize by warrant material necessary to investigate violations of licensing requirements. (Sec. 3) Commerce must also report to such Committees on statutory updates necessary to protect national security, privacy (which is not to be taken as altering any condition or standards for licensing), and the U.S. industrial base, and to reflect the current state of the art of remote sensing systems, instruments, or technologies.
Title
Commercial Remote Sensing Act of 2015
Sponsors
Rep. Jim Bridenstine [R-OK] | Rep. Ed Perlmutter [D-CO] | Rep. Lamar Smith [R-TX] | Rep. Bill Posey [R-FL] |
Rep. Brian Babin [R-TX] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-09-28 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 619. |
2016-09-28 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Science, Space, and Technology. H. Rept. 114-796. |
2015-05-13 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote. |
2015-05-13 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2015-05-12 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Science, Space, and Technology. |
2015-05-12 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB2262 (Related) 2015-11-25 - Became Public Law No: 114-90. (TXT | PDF)
Subjects
Congressional oversight
Licensing and registrations
Science, technology, communications
Spacecraft and satellites
Licensing and registrations
Science, technology, communications
Spacecraft and satellites