US HB2252 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on April 28 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-05-11 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Energy and Mineral Resources.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Energy and Mineral Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 28 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-05-11 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Energy and Mineral Resources.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Energy and Mineral Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Coastal Economies Protection Act This bill amends the Outer Continental Shelf Lands Act to prohibit the Bureau of Ocean Energy Management from offering any tract for oil and gas leasing or preleasing until June 30, 2027, in the following areas: the North Atlantic planning area, the Mid-Atlantic planning area, the South Atlantic planning area, the Straits of Florida planning area, or the Eastern Gulf of Mexico planning area that is within 125 miles of the coastline of Florida.
Title
Coastal Economies Protection Act
Sponsors
Rep. Mark Sanford [R-SC] | Rep. Frank LoBiondo [R-NJ] | Rep. Nydia Velazquez [D-NY] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-11 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Energy and Mineral Resources. |
2017-04-28 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources. |
2017-04-28 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB2002 (Related) 2017-04-19 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Energy and Mineral Resources.
SB2292 (Related) 2018-01-10 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. (Sponsor introductory remarks on measure: CR S139-141)
SB2292 (Related) 2018-01-10 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. (Sponsor introductory remarks on measure: CR S139-141)
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/115th-congress/house-bill/2252/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/115/bills/hr2252/BILLS-115hr2252ih.pdf |