US HB2252 | 2015-2016 | 114th Congress
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 19 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-19 - Became Public Law No: 114-13. (TXT | PDF)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 19 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-19 - Became Public Law No: 114-13. (TXT | PDF)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
To clarify the effective date of certain provisions of the Border Patrol Agent Pay Reform Act of 2014, and for other purposes. This bill amends the Border Patrol Agent Pay Reform Act of 2014 to establish a general effective date for the pay provisions of such Act as the first day of the first pay period beginning on or after January 1, 2016, except that the provision in such Act relating to administering elections and making advance assignments to a regular tour of duty shall be applicable before such effective date to the extent deemed necessary by the Office of Personnel Management (OPM). OPM is authorized to issue regulations as necessary prior to such effective date.
Title
To clarify the effective date of certain provisions of the Border Patrol Agent Pay Reform Act of 2014, and for other purposes.
Sponsors
Rep. Will Hurd [R-TX] | Sen. Peter Welch [D-VT] | Rep. Jason Chaffetz [R-UT] | Rep. Elijah Cummings [D-MD] |
Rep. Blake Farenthold [R-TX] | Rep. Beto O'Rourke [D-TX] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-19 | Senate | Became Public Law No: 114-13. (TXT | PDF) |
2015-05-19 | Senate | Signed by President. |
2015-05-19 | Senate | Presented to President. |
2015-05-19 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2015-05-19 | Senate | Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S3014) |
2015-05-18 | Senate | Received in the Senate, read twice. |
2015-05-14 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2015-05-14 | House | On passage Passed without objection. (text: CR H2999) |
2015-05-14 | House | Considered by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR H2999) |
2015-05-14 | House | Committee on Oversight and Government discharged. (consideration: CR H2999) |
2015-05-14 | House | Mr. Hurd (TX) asked unanimous consent to discharge from committee and consider. (consideration: CR H2999) |
2015-05-12 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Government Reform. |
2015-05-12 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB1356 (Related) 2015-11-25 - Became Public Law No: 114-92. (TXT | PDF)
Subjects
Border security and unlawful immigration
Customs enforcement
Department of Homeland Security
Government employee pay, benefits, personnel management
Government operations and politics
Labor standards
Law enforcement officers
Customs enforcement
Department of Homeland Security
Government employee pay, benefits, personnel management
Government operations and politics
Labor standards
Law enforcement officers