US HB2240 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 10-0)
Status: Introduced on April 10 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-20 - Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution, Civil Rights, and Civil Liberties.
Pending: House Subcommittee on the Constitution, Civil Rights, and Civil Liberties Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 10 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-20 - Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution, Civil Rights, and Civil Liberties.
Pending: House Subcommittee on the Constitution, Civil Rights, and Civil Liberties Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires each bill or joint resolution to include no more than one subject and the subject to be clearly and descriptively expressed in the measure's title. An appropriations bill may not contain any general legislation or change to existing law that is not germane to the subject of such bill. The bill voids measures or provisions noncompliant with these requirements, including appropriation provisions outside the relevant subcommittee's jurisdiction.
Title
One Subject at a Time Act
Sponsors
Rep. Russ Fulcher [R-ID] | Rep. Scott Tipton [R-CO] | Rep. Ralph Norman [R-SC] | Rep. Paul Gosar [R-AZ] |
Rep. Mark Meadows [R-NC] | Rep. Mo Brooks [R-AL] | Rep. Thomas Massie [R-KY] | Rep. Bill Posey [R-FL] |
Rep. Ross Spano [R-FL] | Rep. Andy Biggs [R-AZ] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-20 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution, Civil Rights, and Civil Liberties. |
2019-04-10 | House | Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary. |
2019-04-10 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB6635 (Related) 2020-04-28 - Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary.
SB3845 (Related) 2020-06-01 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Rules and Administration.
SB3845 (Related) 2020-06-01 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Rules and Administration.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-bill/2240/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hr2240/BILLS-116hr2240ih.pdf |