US HB224 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 3 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-12 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 570.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Polar Bear Conservation and Fairness Act This bill amends the Marine Mammal Protection Act of 1972 to direct the Department of the Interior to issue a permit for the importation of a polar bear part (other than an internal organ) from a bear taken in a sport hunt in Canada to a permit applicant who has submitted proof that the polar bear was: (1) legally harvested by the applicant before the May 15, 2008, listing of the polar bear as threatened, and (2) harvested from an approved polar bear population. Interior must issue these permits without regard to limits on importing marine mammals with depleted populations.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Polar Bear Conservation and Fairness Act

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-12HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 570.
2018-06-12HouseReported by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 115-735.
2018-05-16HouseOrdered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
2018-05-16HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
2018-05-16HouseSubcommittee on Water, Power and Oceans Discharged.
2018-05-16HouseSubcommittee on Federal Lands Discharged.
2017-02-10HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Water, Power and Oceans.
2017-02-10HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Federal Lands.
2017-01-03HouseReferred to the House Committee on Natural Resources.
2017-01-03HouseIntroduced in House

Same As/Similar To

HB3668 (Related) 2017-09-18 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 224.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback