US HB2234 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 191-0)
Status: Introduced on March 26 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-10-19 - Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution, Civil Rights, and Civil Liberties.
Pending: House Subcommittee on the Constitution, Civil Rights, and Civil Liberties Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 26 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-10-19 - Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution, Civil Rights, and Civil Liberties.
Pending: House Subcommittee on the Constitution, Civil Rights, and Civil Liberties Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To ensure affordable abortion coverage and care for every person, and for other purposes.
Title
EACH Act of 2021 Equal Access to Abortion Coverage in Health Insurance Act of 2021
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-10-19 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution, Civil Rights, and Civil Liberties. |
2021-06-16 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2021-05-28 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee for Indigenous Peoples of the United States. |
2021-03-29 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2021-03-26 | House | Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committees on Ways and Means, Natural Resources, Armed Services, Veterans' Affairs, the Judiciary, Oversight and Reform, and Foreign Affairs, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2021-03-26 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2021-03-26 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB1021 (Related) 2021-03-25 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/117th-congress/house-bill/2234/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/117/bills/hr2234/BILLS-117hr2234ih.pdf |