US HB2213 | 2015-2016 | 114th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 43-2)
Status: Introduced on May 1 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-06-11 - Hearings Held by the Subcommittee on Financial Institutions and Consumer Credit Prior to Referral.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 1 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-06-11 - Hearings Held by the Subcommittee on Financial Institutions and Consumer Credit Prior to Referral.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To provide for a temporary safe harbor from the enforcement of integrated disclosure requirements for mortgage loan transactions under the Real Estate Settlement Procedures Act of 1974 and the Truth in Lending Act, and for other purposes. This bill prohibits until January 1, 2016, enforcement against any person of integrated disclosure requirements for mortgage loan transactions under the Real Estate Settlement Procedures Act of 1974, the Truth in Lending Act, and regulations issued under such Acts. No suit may be filed against any person for a violation of such requirements occurring before that date, as long as the person has made a good faith effort to comply with them.
Title
To provide for a temporary safe harbor from the enforcement of integrated disclosure requirements for mortgage loan transactions under the Real Estate Settlement Procedures Act of 1974 and the Truth in Lending Act, and for other purposes.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-11 | House | Hearings Held by the Subcommittee on Financial Institutions and Consumer Credit Prior to Referral. |
2015-05-01 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Financial Services. |
2015-05-01 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB1711 (Same As) 2015-07-07 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.
HB3192 (Related) 2015-10-08 - Received in the Senate.
HB3192 (Related) 2015-10-08 - Received in the Senate.
Subjects
Administrative law and regulatory procedures
Civil actions and liability
Finance and financial sector
Housing finance and home ownership
Real estate business
Civil actions and liability
Finance and financial sector
Housing finance and home ownership
Real estate business
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/114th-congress/house-bill/2213/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/114/bills/hr2213/BILLS-114hr2213ih.pdf |