US HB2203 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 29-0)
Status: Engrossed on September 26 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-09-26 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
Pending: Senate Homeland Security And Governmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Homeland Security Improvement Act This bill establishes the position of Ombudsman for Border and Immigration Related Concerns within the Department of Homeland Security (DHS). The ombudsman shall establish an independent, neutral, and standardized process to assist individuals in resolving complaints related to U.S. Customs and Border Protection (CBP), U.S. Immigration and Customs and Enforcement (ICE), and related entities; make recommendations to DHS to address chronic issues identified in the complaints process; establish a Border Oversight Panel, which shall make recommendations related to border enforcement policies and strategies; review ICE and CBP compliance with departmental policies and standards of care for detained aliens; establish a Border Community Liaison in each Border Patrol sector on the northern and southern borders, which shall consult with and receive feedback from border communities on ICE and CBP policies and activities; conduct yearly evaluations of training for ICE and CBP agents and officers, including whether such training adequately addresses the use of force and civil rights issues; develop recommendations for establishing an electronic number system for tracking a child that has been separated from a parent, legal guardian, or relative; and report to Congress a plan to require the use of body-worn cameras by Border Patrol agents and ICE officers.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Homeland Security Improvement Act

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-09-25 - House - On passage RC# 546 (Y: 230 N: 194 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-25 - House - On motion to recommit with instructions RC# 545 (Y: 207 N: 216 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-09-26SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
2019-09-25HouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
2019-09-25HouseOn passage Passed by the Yeas and Nays: 230 - 194 (Roll no. 546). (text: CR H7928-7929)
2019-09-25HouseOn motion to recommit with instructions Failed by recorded vote: 207 - 216 (Roll no. 545).
2019-09-25HouseThe previous question on the motion to recommit with instructions was ordered without objection.
2019-09-25HouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with 10 minutes of debate on the Green (TN) motion to recommit with instructions. The instructions contained in the motion seek to require the bill to be reported back to the House with an amendment to add language at the end of section 711 of the Homeland Security Act of 2002 to require the Ombudsman to include additional information inspecific reports.
2019-09-25HouseMr. Green (TN) moved to recommit with instructions to the Committee on Homeland Security. (text: CR H7974)
2019-09-25HouseConsidered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H7974-7976)
2019-09-25HousePOSTPONED PROCEEDINGS - Pursuant to clause 1(c) of Rule 19, the Chair postponed further proceedings on H.R. 2203.
2019-09-25HouseThe previous question was ordered pursuant to the rule.
2019-09-25HouseDEBATE - The House resumed with debate on H.R. 2203.
2019-09-25HouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with one hour of debate on H.R. 2203.
2019-09-25HouseRule provides for consideration of H.R. 2203, H.R. 3525 and H. Res. 576. Rule provides for consideration of H.R. 2203, H.R. 3525, and H.Res. 576 under closed rules. Rule also provides that it shall be in order at any time on the legislative day of September 26, 2019, for the Speaker to entertain motions that the House suspend the rules; and provides for proceedings during the period from September 30, 2019, through October 14, 2019
2019-09-25HouseConsidered under the provisions of rule H. Res. 577. (consideration: CR H7928-7934)
2019-09-24HouseRules Committee Resolution H. Res. 577 Reported to House. Rule provides for consideration of H.R. 2203, H.R. 3525 and H. Res. 576. Rule provides for consideration of H.R. 2203, H.R. 3525, and H.Res. 576 under closed rules. Rule also provides that it shall be in order at any time on the legislative day of September 26, 2019, for the Speaker to entertain motions that the House suspend the rules; and provides for proceedings during the period from September 30, 2019, through October 14, 2019
2019-07-19HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 122.
2019-07-19HouseCommittee on Ways and Means discharged.
2019-07-19HouseCommittee on the Judiciary discharged.
2019-07-19HouseReported (Amended) by the Committee on Homeland Security. H. Rept. 116-163, Part I.
2019-07-17HouseOrdered to be Reported (Amended) by the Yeas and Nays: 16 - 13.
2019-07-17HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
2019-07-17HouseSubcommittee on Border Security, Facilitation, and Operations Discharged.
2019-05-15HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Immigration and Citizenship.
2019-04-23HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Border Security, Facilitation, and Operations.
2019-04-10HouseReferred to the Committee on Homeland Security, and in addition to the Committees on the Judiciary, and Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2019-04-10HouseReferred to the Committee on Homeland Security, and in addition to the Committees on the Judiciary, and Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2019-04-10HouseReferred to the Committee on Homeland Security, and in addition to the Committees on the Judiciary, and Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2019-04-10HouseIntroduced in House

Same As/Similar To

HB3777 (Related) 2019-08-12 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Immigration and Citizenship.
HR577 (Related) 2019-09-25 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback